Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0623225

EP0623225 - FIBER OPTIC CONNECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/45]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VIDACOVICH, Kenneth, J.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / BERGLUND, Sidney, J.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / BOVE, Steven, C.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[1994/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/45]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date93902722.322.12.1992
[1994/45]
WO1992US11169
Priority number, dateUS1992082539824.01.1992         Original published format: US 825398
[1994/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9315426
Date:05.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0623225
Date:09.11.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993
[1994/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0623225
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1993
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[1994/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/45]
TitleGerman:FASEROPTISCHES VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM[1994/45]
English:FIBER OPTIC CONNECTION SYSTEM[1994/45]
French:SYSTEME DE CONNEXION DE FIBRES OPTIQUES[1994/45]
Entry into regional phase22.08.1994National basic fee paid 
22.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/45]
24.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.1999Fee for grant paid
01.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3530162
 [A]WO8202254
 [A]US4840449