Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0629133

EP0629133 - PEPTIDE-METAL ION PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/51]PROTEIN- AND PEPTIDE-METAL ION PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATIONS
[1999/33]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2010New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
30.07.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 01.09.2010  [2010/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhomed, Incorporated
4261 Balloon Park Road, N.E. Albuquerque
New Mexico 87109 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/51]For all designated states
Rhomed, Incorporated
4261 Balloon Park Road, N.E.
Albuquerque, New Mexico 87109 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RHODES, Buck, A.
1104 Stanford Drive, Northeast
Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US
02 / ZAMORA, Paul, O.
1514 Vassar, Northeast
Albuquerque, NM 87106 / US
[1994/51]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [1998/45]Braun, André
BRAUN & PARTNER Patent-, Marken-, Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22
4054 Basel / CH
Former [1998/17]Warden, John Christopher
Abbots Piece Church Lane Islip
GB-Oxfordshire OX5 2TA / GB
Former [1997/46]Braun, André
BRAUN & PARTNER Patent-, Marken-, Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22
4054 Basel / CH
Former [1996/49]Martin, Björn
A. Kerr AG Finkelerweg 44
CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH
Former [1994/51]Kerr, Andrew
A.KERR AG, Postfach 444, Finkelerweg 44
CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH
Application number, filing date93902846.031.12.1992
[1994/51]
WO1992US11334
Priority number, dateUS1992081647603.01.1992         Original published format: US 816476
US1992081647703.01.1992         Original published format: US 816477
US1992084007720.02.1992         Original published format: US 840077
US1992099882030.12.1992         Original published format: US 998820
US1992099891030.12.1992         Original published format: US 998910
[1994/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9312819
Date:08.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0629133
Date:21.12.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993
[1994/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0629133
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.07.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61K51/00
[2006/38]
Former International [1999/33]A61K51/08, C07K7/08
Former International [1994/51]A61K49/02, A61K43/00, C07K7/00, C07K15/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/51]
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ANWENDUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON PEPTID-METALL-IONEN[1999/33]
English:PEPTIDE-METAL ION PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATIONS[1999/33]
French:APPLICATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A BASE D'IONS METALLIQUES ET PEPTIDES[1999/33]
Former [1994/51]PHARMAZEUTISCHE ANWENDUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON PROTEIN- UND PEPTID-METALL-IONEN
Former [1994/51]PROTEIN- AND PEPTIDE-METAL ION PHARMACEUTICAL APPLICATIONS
Former [1994/51]APPLICATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A BASE D'IONS METALLIQUES-PROTEINES ET PEPTIDES
Entry into regional phase29.07.1994National basic fee paid 
29.07.1994Search fee paid 
29.07.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
29.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/51]
28.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2000Fee for grant paid
18.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
ANTISOMA PLC
West Africa House, Hanger Lane, Ealing
LONDON, W5 3QR / GB
Opponent's representative
Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 02  29.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Schering AG
Müllerstrasse 178
13342 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/47]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
ANTISOMA PLC
West Africa House, Hanger Lane, Ealing
LONDON, W5 3QR / GB
Opponent's representative
Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
 02  29.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Schering AG
Müllerstrasse 178
13342 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2008/33]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
ANTISOMA PLC
West Africa House, Hanger Lane, Ealing
LONDON, W5 3QR / GB
Opponent's representative
Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
 02  29.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Schering AG
Müllerstrasse 178
13342 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr., et al
Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman Postfach 22 16 61
80506 München / DE
Former [2005/03]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
ANTISOMA PLC
West Africa House, Hanger Lane, Ealing
LONDON, W5 3QR / GB
Opponent's representative
Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
 02  29.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Schering AG
Müllerstrasse 178
13342 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr., et al
Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman Postfach 22 16 61
80506 München / DE
Former [2001/44]
Opponent(s)01  28.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
ANTISOMA PLC
West Africa House, Hanger Lane, Ealing
LONDON, W5 3QR / GB
Opponent's representative
Thomas, Philip John Duval, et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
 02  29.08.2001  12.09.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Schering AG
Müllerstrasse 178
13342 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich (DE), et al
Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman Triftstrasse 13
D-80538 München / DE
08.10.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.11.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
25.04.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.04.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.11.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/35]
28.11.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition28.06.2006Appeal received No.  T1009/06
04.09.2006Statement of grounds filed
28.11.2008Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
28.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
FR31.12.2007
GB31.12.2007
IT31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
SE01.01.2008
DK02.01.2008
ES02.01.2008
NL01.07.2008
[2010/05]
Former [2009/30]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
FR31.12.2007
GB31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
SE01.01.2008
DK02.01.2008
ES02.01.2008
NL01.07.2008
Former [2009/20]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
GB31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
SE01.01.2008
DK02.01.2008
ES02.01.2008
NL01.07.2008
Former [2009/08]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
GB31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
SE01.01.2008
DK02.01.2008
NL01.07.2008
Former [2009/07]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
GB31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
SE01.01.2008
NL01.07.2008
Former [2009/03]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
GB31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
NL01.07.2008
Former [2009/01]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
NL01.07.2008
Former [2008/48]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
Former [2008/43]AT31.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
Former [2008/39]AT31.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0359347  (NEORX CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 47 - line 52 * * page 10, line 40 - page 11, line 14 * * claims 5,13 *;
 [PX]WO9213572  (DIATECH INC [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 5, line 34; example - * * claims 6,7 *;
 [X]EP0250013  (MALLINCKRODT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7,10 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0210684  (MALLINCKRODT INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7,10 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0196669  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7,10 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9101144  (SANDOZ AG [AT], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,10 * examples 8-10 *;
 [X]WO9117173  (CYTOGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7,10 * example 8 *;
 [PX]  ZAMORA P O ET AL, "DIRECT TECHNETIUM-99M LABELING OF A PLATELET-BINDING LAMININ PEPTIDE", 39TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA, USA, JUNE 9-12, 1992. & J NUCL MED, VOL. 33, NO. 5 (SUPPL.). 1992. PAGES 1029-1030, ABSTRACT 878, (199205), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 1031 - 1032, XP002998687 [PX] 1-10 * abstract *
 [PX]  M. NAKAYAMA ET AL., "DIRECT Tc-99m LABELING OF ANTIBODY WITH MACROMOLECULAR Sn(II) COMPLEXES", 39TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA, USA, JUNE 9-12, 1992. & J NUCL MED, VOL. 33, NO. 5 (SUPPL.). 1992, PAGES 1029-1030, ABSTRACT 869, (199205), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 1029 - 1030, XP002998688 [PX] 1,8-10 * abstract *
 [X]  ZAMORA P O ET AL, "A SECOND Tc-99m BINDING SITE IN IgG IS RELATED TO HISTIDINE GROUPS", 39TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA, USA, JUNE 9-12, 1992. & J NUCL MED, VOL. 33, NO. 5 (SUPPL.), 1992, PAGES 1029-1030, ABSTRACT 868, (199205), vol. 33, no. 5, page 1029, XP002998689 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
 [Y]  LIOTTA LA ET AL, "LAMININ RECEPTORS ON HUMAN BREAST CARCINOMA: ROLE IN INVASION OF THE EXTRACELLULAR MATRIX", UNDERSTANDING BREAST CANCER: CLINICAL AND LABORATORY CONCEPTS. RICH MA, HAGER JC, FURMANSKI P, EDS. NEW YORK, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., PAGES 87-96, 1983., pages 87 - 97, XP001202194 [Y] 1-10 * page 95 - page 96 *
 [Y]  SANDROCK D ET AL, "KINETICS OF IV-INJECTED 131I-LABELED LAMININ-C1 FRAGMENT IN NORMAL AND TUMOR-BEARING NUDE MICE (MEETING ABSTRACT) (abstract 390)", PROC ANNU MEET AM ASSOC CANCER RES 9, (198903), vol. 30, page 99, XP008067728 [Y] 1-10 * abstract *
 [T]  ZAMORA P O ET AL, "BIOLOGICAL DISTRIBUTION OF TECHNETIUM-99M LABELED YIGSR AND IKVAV LAMININ PEPTIDES IN RODENTS TECHNETIUM-99M IKVAV PEPTIDE LOCALIZES TO THE LUNG.", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1993), vol. 1182, no. 2, pages 197 - 204, XP003000073 [T] 1-10 * Methods and Materials * * Discussion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4439(93)90141-M
 [T]  ZAMORA P O ET AL, "LUNG UPTAKE OF TECHNETIUM-99M LAMININ PEPTIDE PA22-2 IS DECREASED IN EMPHYSEMA AND INCREASED IN TUMORED LUNG", 40TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, TORONTO, ONTARIO, CANADA, JUNE 8-11, 1993.;& J NUCL MED,, VOL. 34, NO. 5 SUPPL., PAGE(S) 244P, 1993., page 244P, XP002998690 [T] 1-10 * No. 1133 *
 [T]  WANG G-J ET AL, "A Tc-99m labeled laminin derived peptide, Tc-99m-YIGSR for thrombus specific imaging.", 41ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA, JUNE 5-8, 1994.;& JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE 35, NO. 5 SUPPL., PAGE(S) 106P, 1994., (19940608), page 106P, XP002998691 [T] 1-10 * No. 420 *
 [PY]  M.V. PIMM ET AL, "111-In labelling of a branched polypeptide drug carrier with a poly(L-lysine) backbone", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19920112), vol. 79, pages 77 - 80, XP000431687 [PY] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(92)90096-K
International search[X]CA2016235
 [X]WO9015818
 [X]WO8910760
 [A]GB2225579
 [X]WO9117173
 [X]WO8807382
 [XP]US5128119
 [AP]US5116596
 [Y]US4917878
 [X]  7th International Symposium on Radiopharmacology, Abstracts, (1991) COX et al., "Technetium Labelled Somato statin a Potential Agent for In Vivo Tumor Localization", p. 16
 [Y]  Immunology (1991), Volume 72, THOMPSON et al., "Identification of an Amino Acid Sequence in the Iamminan A Chain Mediating Mask Cell Attachment and Spreading", pp. 144-149
ExaminationUS5102990
 US5277893
 US5277892