Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0629133 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0629133



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1805
29.07.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
23.01.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.12.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.12.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.12.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.12.2008 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
22.12.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
28.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
22.10.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.10.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.10.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
12.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.08.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Appeal 1
14.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.08.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
01.08.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.07.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.03.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.03.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
07.02.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
05.02.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
22.01.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.09.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
04.09.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 40
06.07.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
29.06.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.06.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 8
25.04.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
25.04.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
25.04.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 14
25.04.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 20
25.04.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.04.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 38
17.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.10.2005 Claims Opposition 8
04.10.2005 Claims Opposition 6
04.10.2005 Claims Opposition 7
04.10.2005 Claims Opposition 7
04.10.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 36
30.09.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 27
28.09.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.09.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
08.07.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 34
10.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
01.08.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.08.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.08.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.08.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.04.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
10.04.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
10.04.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
26.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.11.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.11.2002 Claims Opposition 2
18.11.2002 Description Opposition 2
18.11.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 35
25.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.08.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.08.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.06.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.06.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.04.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.04.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
25.02.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.02.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.2002 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
04.02.2002 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
29.01.2002 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
08.10.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.10.2001 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.10.2001 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.09.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.09.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.08.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.08.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
29.08.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
29.08.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.08.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 28
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 114
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 69
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 62
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
29.08.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
28.08.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
28.08.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
19.10.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.08.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.08.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
18.08.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
16.08.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.05.2000 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
25.04.2000 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
22.04.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.04.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
05.04.2000 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
07.12.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
07.12.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
07.10.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.02.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
10.12.1998 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
18.11.1998 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
05.10.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 137
29.08.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.08.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.08.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.08.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.08.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.1998 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
08.06.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.03.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.01.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.09.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.09.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.10.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
26.09.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
29.12.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.02.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.12.1994 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.12.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.12.1994 Partial European search report Search / examination 16
09.11.1994 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.11.1994 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
12.10.1994 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.08.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
29.07.1994 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
14.04.1994 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
10.08.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.07.1993 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
20.07.1993 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 60
20.07.1993 Priority document Search / examination 44
20.07.1993 Priority document Search / examination 34
20.07.1993 Priority document Search / examination 62
20.07.1993 Priority document Search / examination 52
20.07.1993 Priority document Search / examination 50