blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0625947

EP0625947 - A RAILWAY SIGNALLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.03.2000
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE AND SIGNAL HOLDINGS LIMITED
Pew Hill Chippenham
Wiltshire SN15 1RT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/48]For all designated states
WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE AND SIGNAL HOLDINGS LIMITED
Pew Hill
Chippenham Wiltshire SN15 1RT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / NEWMAN, Gregory, David 221b London Road
Chippenham
Wiltshire SN15 3AP / GB
[1994/48]
Representative(s)Newstead, Michael John
Page Hargrave
Southgate
Whitefriars
Lewins Mead
Bristol BS1 2NT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Newstead, Michael John
Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead
Bristol BS1 2NT / GB
Former [1994/48]Newstead, Michael John
Page & Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate
Bristol BS1 6PL / GB
Application number, filing date93903258.710.02.1993
[1994/48]
WO1993GB00270
Priority number, dateGB1992000283011.02.1992         Original published format: GB 9202830
[1994/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9315946
Date:19.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0625947
Date:30.11.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0625947
Date:15.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/03]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0625947
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1993
ClassificationIPC:B61L27/00
[1994/48]
CPC:
B60T7/18 (EP,US); B61L27/00 (KR); B61L27/20 (EP,US);
B60T13/665 (EP,US); B60T17/228 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/48]
TitleGerman:EISENBAHNANMELDEANLAGE[1994/48]
English:A RAILWAY SIGNALLING SYSTEM[1994/48]
French:SYSTEME DE SIGNALISATION FERROVIAIRE[1994/48]
Entry into regional phase02.08.1994National basic fee paid 
02.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
02.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
02.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/48]
18.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.07.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1996Fee for grant paid
08.10.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.10.1997  30.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Alcatel Alsthom Compagnie Générale d'Electricité
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Pohl, Herbert
Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
 02  06.10.1997  22.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 03  14.10.1997  27.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
ADTRANZ ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Signal)
Estover Close,Plymouth
Devon PL6 7PU / GB
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Ivor Stanley
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1997/49]
Opponent(s)01  06.10.1997   
Alcatel Alsthom Compagnie Générale d'Electricité
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Pohl, Herbert
Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
 02  06.10.1997   
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
 03  14.10.1997    ADMISSIBLE
ADTRANZ ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Signal)
Estover Close,Plymouth
Devon PL6 7PU / GB
Opponent's representative
Harrison, Ivor Stanley
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Former [1997/48]
Opponent(s)01  06.10.1997    ADMISSIBLE
Alcatel Alsthom Compagnie Générale d'Electricité
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Pohl, Herbert
Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
 02  06.10.1997   
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
21.11.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.06.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.06.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.06.1999Date of oral proceedings
13.08.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.08.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.11.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
21.02.2000Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR2391100  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
 [Y]  - 39TH IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE VOL. II, MAY 1-3,1989 YUTAKA HASEGAWA ET AL. A NEW TRAIN CONTROL SYSTEM BY RADIO
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.