Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0627045

EP0627045 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE INTAKE AND EXHAUST SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHABRY, Alexander
2/64 Market Street
Randwick, NSW 2031 / AU
[1994/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/49]
Representative(s)Tillbrook, Christopher John
The Intellectual Property Shop Ltd. The Old Village Hall
School Street
Churchover
Rugby Warwickshire CV23 0EG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/49]Tillbrook, Christopher John
Chris J Tillbrook & Co 5 Old Rectory Close Churchover
Rugby, Warwickshire CV23 0EN / GB
Application number, filing date93903729.717.02.1993
[1994/49]
WO1993AU00066
Priority number, dateAU1992000091617.02.1992         Original published format: AU 91692
[1994/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9316272
Date:19.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0627045
Date:07.12.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1993
[1994/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0627045
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU19.08.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:F02B27/00, F02B27/04, F02M35/10, F01N7/08
[1994/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/49]
TitleGerman:EIN- UND AUSLASSVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[1994/49]
English:INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE INTAKE AND EXHAUST SYSTEMS[1994/49]
French:SYSTEMES D'ADMISSION ET D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE[1994/49]
Entry into regional phase10.08.1994National basic fee paid 
10.08.1994Search fee paid 
10.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
10.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/49]
15.10.1996Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
01.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1999Fee for grant paid
05.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
LU17.02.2000
MC19.03.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2004/07]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
MC19.03.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2003/45]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
MC19.03.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
MC19.03.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/42]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
MC19.03.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/23]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/17]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
IE17.02.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0669255  ;
 [X]DE4003282  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US4175504  (EDERER GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]FR697940  (DUCASSE) [A] 9 * page 2, line 37 - line 49; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2101205  (VIZARD DAVID) [A] 9 * figure 2 *;
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850827), vol. 9, no. 209, Database accession no. (M - 407), [X] 1,7 * abstract *
 [A]  - A. GRAHAM BELL, Performance Tuning in Theory and Practice, HAYNES SPARKFORD GB, FOULIS, (1981), XP002009661 [A] 9 * page 112 - page 114; figure 4.2A *
International search[X]FR1167132  ;
 [A]AU3052357  ;
 [A]US2947293  (ZORA ARKUS-DUNTOV);
 [A]US4466389  (ARKUS-DUNTOV ZORA [US]);
 [A]JP58015718  ;
 [A]US2106427  (OSCAR HANSSON);
 [A]US4206600  (FEULING JAMES J [US]);
 [A]WO9203639  (FLOWMASTER INC [US]);
 [A]EP0284466  (PEUGEOT [FR], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M208, page 44; & JP,A,58 015 718 (NISSAN DIESEL KOGYO K K), Abstract.,