Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0629234

EP0629234 - LUBRICANTS FOR CHAIN BELT CONVEYORS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  11.12.1999
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.1999Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/04]
Former [1994/51]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STROTHOFF, Werner
Eggbergstrasse 8
D-7888 Rheinfelden 4 / DE
02 / WINKEMANN, Birgit
Ginsterpfad 1a
D-4150 Krefeld / DE
[1994/51]
Application number, filing date93904003.622.02.1993
[1994/51]
WO1993EP00412
Priority number, dateDE1992420650502.03.1992         Original published format: DE 4206505
[1994/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9318120
Date:16.09.1993
Language:DE
[1993/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0629234
Date:21.12.1994
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993
[1994/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0629234
Date:15.11.1995
Language:DE
[1995/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0629234
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.09.1993
ClassificationInternational:C10M173/02
[1994/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/51]
TitleGerman:KETTENTRANSPORTBAND-SCHMIERMITTEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[1994/51]
English:LUBRICANTS FOR CHAIN BELT CONVEYORS AND THEIR USE[1994/51]
French:LUBRIFIANTS POUR BANDES TRANSPORTEUSES COMMANDEES PAR CHAINE ET LEUR UTILISATION[1994/51]
Entry into regional phase24.08.1994National basic fee paid 
24.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
24.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/51]
10.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.1995Fee for grant paid
29.07.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.08.1996  13.09.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455 /
Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M.
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1997/31]
Opponent(s)01  15.08.1996  13.09.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M.
Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1996/41]
Opponent(s)01  15.08.1996  13.09.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Opponent's representative
Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
18.09.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.01.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
19.02.1999Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.05.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.05.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.08.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
24.11.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE23.02.1997
[1998/12]
Cited inInternational search[A]US3574100  ;
 [A]EP0372628  ;
 [A]DE3905548
 [A]  - Section Ch, Week 3880, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class C, AN 80-667870