Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0680356

EP0680356 - CATHETER INTRODUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Schwertstrasse 9
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Schwertstrasse 9
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [1995/45]For all designated states
SHERWOOD MEDICAL COMPANY
1915 Olive Street
St. Louis, MO 63103-1642 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OKADA, Yosuke
2748-1, Morimachi Ichimyyia
Shyuchi-gun, Shizuoka Prefecture / JP
02 / KURIMOTO, Munehito, Nippon Sherwood Med. Ind., Ltd
Nippon Brunswick Building 5F, 7-27, 5-chome
Sendagaya, Shibuya-ku / JP
[2000/15]
Former [1995/45]01 / OKADA, Yosuke
2748-1, Morimachi Ichimyyia
Shyuchi-gun, Shizuoka Prefecture / JP
02 / KURIMOTO, Munehito, Nippon Sherwood Med. Ind., Ltd
ippon Brunswick Building 5F, 7-27, 5-chome
Sendagaya, Shibuya-ku / JP
Representative(s)Rüedi, Regula Béatrice , et al
E. Blum & Co.
Patentanwälte VSP
Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]Rüedi, Regula Béatrice , et al
E. Blum & Co. Patentanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
Former [1995/45]Porter, Graham Ronald
c/o Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South
Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
Application number, filing date93904520.905.01.1993
[1995/45]
WO1993US00437
Priority number, dateJP19920000161U07.01.1992         Original published format: JP 16192 U
JP19920002826U29.01.1992         Original published format: JP 282692 U
[1995/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9313822
Date:22.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0680356
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0680356
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06
[1995/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/45]
TitleGerman:KATHETEREINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG[1995/45]
English:CATHETER INTRODUCER[1995/45]
French:INTRODUCTEUR DE CATHETER[1995/45]
Entry into regional phase27.07.1994National basic fee paid 
27.07.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
27.07.1994Examination requested  [1995/45]
11.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2000Fee for grant paid
08.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]US4772266  (GROSHONG LEROY E [US]);
 [X]US3406685  (MAY EDWIN A);
 [A]EP0258566  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0171077  (TERUMO CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0008451  (ABBOTT LAB [US])