Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0634023

EP0634023 - COMPACT OBJECTIVE LENS WITH TWO LENS GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POLAROID CORPORATION
549 Technology Square Cambridge
Massachusetts 02139 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/03]For all designated states
POLAROID CORPORATION
549 Technology Square
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAKER, James, G.
14 French Drive
Bedford, NH 03102 / US
02 / PLUMMER, William, T.
129 Arena Terrace
Concord, MA 01742 / US
03 / VAN TASSELL, Jon
133 Range Road
Concord, MA 01742 / US
[1995/03]
Representative(s)Koch, Günther , et al
Patentanwälte
Wallach, Koch, Dr.Haibach, Feldkamp
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/03]Koch, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
D-80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date93906046.318.02.1993
[1995/03]
WO1993US01438
Priority number, dateUS1992086040130.03.1992         Original published format: US 860401
[1995/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9320470
Date:14.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0634023
Date:18.01.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993
[1995/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0634023
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.10.1993
ClassificationInternational:G02B9/08, G02B13/18
[1995/03]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/03]
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTES OBJEKTIV MIT ZWEI LINSENGRUPPEN[1995/03]
English:COMPACT OBJECTIVE LENS WITH TWO LENS GROUPS[1995/03]
French:SYSTEME DE LENTILLE D'OBJECTIF COMPACT A DEUX GROUPES DE LENTILLES[1995/03]
Entry into regional phase30.08.1994National basic fee paid 
30.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.08.1994Examination requested  [1995/03]
27.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
26.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1999Fee for grant paid
30.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]US4109995  (BETENSKY) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10 * column 1, line 30 - column 4, line 67; figures 1,2,4; tables 5,10 *;
 [A]JPH02253224  ;
 [A]CH195702  (CARL ZEISS) [A] 1,4,9 * figures 1,2; example 1 *;
 [A]US4457592  (BAKER) [A] 4 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 28; figure 1 *;
 [AD]US4443067  (OWEN) [AD] 1,4 * column A; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901227), vol. 014, no. 585, Database accession no. (P - 1148), & JP02253224 A 19901012 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract *