Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0632796

EP0632796 - TOLUENE DISPROPORTIONATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION (a New York corporation)
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, Virginia 22037 / US
[1995/02]
Inventor(s)01 / CHANG, Clarence, Dayton
11 Murray Place
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
02 / RODEWALD, Paul, Gerhard, Jr.
4 Merritt Lane
Rocky Hill, NJ 08553 / US
[1995/02]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/34]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [1995/52]Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
European Office of Patent Counsel Mobil House 500-600 Witan Gate
Central Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK9 1ES / GB
Former [1995/02]Colmer, Stephen Gary
European Office of Patent Counsel Mobil House 500-600 Witan Gate
Central Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK9 1ES / GB
Application number, filing date93907445.611.03.1993
[1995/02]
WO1993US02255
Priority number, dateUS1992085010512.03.1992         Original published format: US 850105
US1992085010412.03.1992         Original published format: US 850104
US1992093975202.09.1992         Original published format: US 939752
[1995/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9317987
Date:16.09.1993
Language:EN
[1993/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0632796
Date:11.01.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993
[1995/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0632796
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.09.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:C07C15/08, C07C6/12, B01J29/04
[1995/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/02]
TitleGerman:DISPROPORTIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN VON TOLUOL[1995/02]
English:TOLUENE DISPROPORTIONATION PROCESS[1995/02]
French:PROCESSUS DE DISPROPORTIONNEMENT DU TOLUENE[1995/02]
Entry into regional phase20.08.1994National basic fee paid 
20.08.1994Search fee paid 
20.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
20.08.1994Examination requested  [1995/02]
27.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
07.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1999Fee for grant paid
13.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
05.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2566389  (RES ASSOC UTILIZ LIGHT OIL [JP]) [X] 1,11-14 * example 3 *;
 JPS59190928  [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [X]EP0289691  (TAIWAN STYRENE MONOMER CORP [TW]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * example 14; claim - *;
 [L]WO9317788  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [L] 1-15 * example 31; claim - *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850401), vol. 102, no. 13, Database accession no. 113006z, page 667 [X] 1,8,13,14 * abstract *
International search[Y]US4090981  (RODEWALD PAUL GERHARD [US]);
 [Y]US4127616  (RODEWALD PAUL GERHARD [US]);
 [Y]US4465866  (TAKAISHI NAOTAKE [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4477583  (RODEWALD PAUL G [US]);
 [A]US4851604  (ABSIL ROBERT P L [US], et al);
 [Y]US4891458  (INNES ROBERT A [US], et al);
 [X]US4950853  (CROOKSTON RONALD W [US]);
 [A]US4962257  (ABSIL ROBERT P L [US], et al);
 [A]US5030787  (ABSIL ROBERT P L [US], et al);
 [A]US5053573  (JORGENSEN DIANE V [US], et al)
 [Y]  - Jour. Catalysis, 1991, HIBINO et al., "Shape Selectively over HZSM-5 Modified by Chemical Vapor Deposition of Silicon Oxide", pp. 551-558.