EP0633965 - CUT EXPANSION JOINT SEALING DEVICE FOR CONCRETE DAMS AND METHOD FOR FITTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states HYDRO-QUEBEC 75, Boulevard René Levesque Ouest Montréal Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZITA, Peter 928 Paul Sicotte Sainte-Thérèse, Québec J7E 5A1 / CA | 02 /
DUBREUIL, Louis 11252 Lauzanne Montréal-Nord, Québec H1H 5B8 / CA | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93907701.2 | 26.03.1993 | [1995/03] | WO1993CA00126 | Priority number, date | CA19922064429 | 30.03.1992 Original published format: CA 2064429 | [1995/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9320288 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633965 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633965 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/16, E21B19/24 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
E21B7/28 (EP,US);
B23B47/28 (EP,US);
E02B3/16 (EP,US);
E21B17/1057 (EP,US);
E21B7/001 (EP,US);
B23B2247/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/03] | E02B3/16, E21C9/00, E21B19/00 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | Dichtungsvorrichtung für Abdichtung von Dehnungsfugen in Betonstaudämmen und Einrichtungsverfahren derselben | [1995/03] | English: | CUT EXPANSION JOINT SEALING DEVICE FOR CONCRETE DAMS AND METHOD FOR FITTING SAME | [1995/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEITE POUR SCELLEMENT DE JOINTS D'EXPANSION COUPES DANS DES BARRAGES EN BETON ET PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION DU DISPOSITIF | [1995/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 24.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.06.2003 | SE | 11.09.2003 | ES | 22.09.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/10] | SE | 11.09.2003 | |
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | ES | 22.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4655638 (WARING STEPHEN T [US]) [A] 1-3,8,16,17,30 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 20 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 35 *; | [A]US3342033 (CROUCH ROBERT L, et al) [A] 1,2,16 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 53; figures 4,5 *; | [A]AU456875B (A. GOETTL) [A] 1,2 * page 5, paragraph 9 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 2-4 *; | [A]JPS61172907 ; | [XY]FR22446E (FREDERIC GUILLIERME [FR]) [X] 32 * page 2, line 101 - page 3, line 19 * [Y] 33-40; | [XY]FR2312605 (WIBOM GUSTAF [SE]) [X] 32 * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 4 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 22 - line 24 * [Y] 33-40; | [YA]CH424850 (INGERSOLL RAND CO [FR]) [Y] 35,36 * page 5, line 79 - line 92 * [A] 32,33; | [XA]US2341322 (HUBBELL OREB T) [X] 32 * page 2, column L, line 29 - line 52 * [A] 33; | [A]FR1429417 (BINAUT) [A] 32,33 * the whole document *; | [A]SE365022 (WIBOM) [A] 32,33 * the whole document *; | [A]US2368511 (ZIMMERMAN ROBERT D) [A] 32,33 * the whole document *; | [A]US1719003 (DOWNING EDWIN J, et al) [A] 32,33 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861219), vol. 10, no. 381, Database accession no. (M - 547)<2438> , & JP61172907 A 19860804 (BRIDGESTONE) [A] 1 * abstract * |