Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0635027

EP0635027 - PEPTIDE T AND RELATED PEPTIDES IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION, INCLUDING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED IMMUNIT T, INC.
25 East Loop Road
Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US
[2000/23]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
PEPTECH LIMITED
35-41 Waterloo Road
North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU
For all designated states
DRUG ROYALTY CORPORATION
8 King Street East, Suite 202
Toronto, Ontario M5c 1B5 / CA
Former [1995/04]For all designated states
PEPTIDE TECHNOLOGY LTD
4-10 Inman Road, P.O. Box 444
Dee Why, NSW 2099 / AU
For all designated states
DRUG ROYALTY CORPORATION
8 King Street East, Suite 202
Toronto, Ontario M5c 1B5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSEN, Anders, Jörgen
Havrevaenget 331
DK-2980 Kokkedal / DK
02 / ASTON, Roger
Eastcourt Cottage, Eastcourt
Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 9HW / GB
03 / CARLEN, Peter, Louis
529 St. Clements Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M5N 1M3 / CA
04 / DOOB, Penelope, Reed
1 Fenwick Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M4J 3HZ / CA
05 / MacFADDEN, Douglas, Kevin
228 Chatham Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M4J 1K9 / CA
06 / PHIPPS, David, James
81 Pauline Avenue, Apt. 1
Toronto, Ontario M6H 3M7 / CA
07 / RATHJEN, Deborah
4 Eddy Street
Thornleigh, NSW 2120 / AU
08 / WIDMER, Fred
35 Anzac Avenue
Ryde, NSW 2112 / AU
[1995/04]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1998/43]Chapman, Paul William , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [1995/04]Sheard, Andrew Gregory , et al
Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date93907942.229.03.1993
[1995/04]
WO1993GB00649
Priority number, dateUS1992085883227.03.1992         Original published format: US 858832
DK1992000064514.05.1992         Original published format: DK 64592
US1992091511817.07.1992         Original published format: US 915118
US1992098767409.12.1992         Original published format: US 987674
[1995/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9320102
Date:14.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0635027
Date:25.01.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993
[1995/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0635027
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.10.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/00, C07K5/10, C07K7/06
[1999/28]
Former International [1995/04]C07K5/10, C07K7/06, A61K37/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/04]
TitleGerman:T-PEPTID UND DAMIT VERWANDTE PEPTIDE IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGEN EINSCHLIESSLICH DER MULTIPLEN SKLEROSE[1995/04]
English:PEPTIDE T AND RELATED PEPTIDES IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATION, INCLUDING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS[1995/04]
French:PEPTIDE T ET PEPTIDES ASSOCIES DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DES INFLAMMATIONS, NOTAMMENT LA SCLEROSE EN PLAQUES[1995/04]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1994National basic fee paid 
23.09.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.1994Examination requested  [1995/04]
23.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2000Fee for grant paid
19.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99101349.1  / EP0960886
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Request for further processing for:28.08.1998Request for further processing filed
28.08.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.1998Decision despatched
07.02.1997Request for further processing filed
07.02.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
26.02.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199705   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE12.07.2000
GR12.07.2000
PT12.10.2000
SE12.10.2000
IE29.03.2001
LU29.03.2001
MC31.03.2001
[2006/39]
Former [2005/23]BE12.07.2000
GR12.07.2000
PT12.10.2000
SE12.10.2000
IE29.03.2001
LU29.03.2001
Former [2004/07]BE12.07.2000
GR12.07.2000
PT12.10.2000
SE12.10.2000
IE29.03.2001
Former [2002/14]BE12.07.2000
PT12.10.2000
SE12.10.2000
IE29.03.2001
Former [2001/27]BE12.07.2000
PT12.10.2000
SE12.10.2000
Former [2001/22]BE12.07.2000
PT12.10.2000
Former [2001/18]PT12.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8912067  (US HEALTH [US]);
 [X]FR2603107  (GENETIC SYSTEMS CORP [US]);
 [X]EP0249390  (PERT CANDACE B [US], et al);
 [Y]WO8809338  (SYNTBIOTECH INC [US]);
 [XP]WO9219257  (US HEALTH [US])
 [X]  - FILE SERVER STN KARLSRUHE,FILE MEDLINE ABSTRACT NO.89131477,
 [A]  - FILE SERVER STN KARLSRUHE,FILE MEDLINE ABSTRACT NO.77209062,
 [X]  - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS vol. 171, no. 2, 14 September 1990, NEW YORK,USA pages 596 - 602 COTELLE ET AL 'CONFORMATIONAL STUDY OF THE THREONINE-RICH C-TERMINAL PENTAPEPTIDE OF PEPTIDE T',
 [A]  - GASTROENTEROLOGY vol. 96, no. 5(2), 1989, NEW YORK,USA page A471 SIBUG ET AL 'ACUTE AND CHRONIC EFFECTS OF MAST CELL MEDIATORS ON INTESTINAL EPITHELIAL FUNCTION',
 [XP]  - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS vol. 184, no. 2, 30 April 1992, NEW YORK,USA pages 1125 - 1132 URGE ET AL 'CHEMICAL GLYCOSYLATION OF PEPTIDE T AT NATURAL AND ARTIFICIAL GLYCOSYLATION SITES STABILIZES OR REARRANGES THE DOMINANT REVERSE TURN STRUCTURE' cited in the application,