Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0634055

EP0634055 - REVERSIBLE THERMOELECTRIC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.1999
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YATER, Joseph C.
71 Autumn Lane
Lincoln, MA 01773 / US
For all designated states
YATER, Jane A.
5250 Columbia Road, No. 745 N. Olmstead
Ohio 44070 / US
For all designated states
YATER, Joan E.
2000 Huntington Avenue, No. 205 Alexandria
Virginia 22303 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/03]For all designated states
YATER, Joseph C.
71 Autumn Lane
Lincoln, MA 01773 / US
For all designated states
YATER, Jane A.
5250 Columbia Road, No. 745
N. Olmstead, Ohio 44070 / US
For all designated states
YATER, Joan E.
2000 Huntington Avenue, No. 205
Alexandria, Virginia 22303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1995/03]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/03]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date93908635.129.03.1993
[1995/03]
WO1993US02904
Priority number, dateUS1992086067730.03.1992         Original published format: US 860677
[1995/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9320589
Date:14.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0634055
Date:18.01.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993
[1995/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0634055
Date:23.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.10.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01L37/00, F25B21/04, H01H85/02, H03K3/313, H03K3/33, H03K23/80, H01L35/00, H01L29/12
[1998/20]
Former International [1995/11]H01L37/00, F25B21/04, H01H85/02, H03K3/313, H03K3/33, H03K23/80, H01L35/00, H01L29/14
Former International [1995/03]H01L37/00, F25B21/04, H01H85/02, H03K3/313, H03K3/33, H03K23/80
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/03]
TitleGerman:UMKEHRBARER THERMOELEKTRISCHER KONVERTER.[1995/03]
English:REVERSIBLE THERMOELECTRIC CONVERTER[1995/03]
French:CONVERTISSEUR THERMOELECTRIQUE REVERSIBLE[1995/03]
Entry into regional phase31.10.1994National basic fee paid 
31.10.1994Search fee paid 
31.10.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
31.10.1994Examination requested  [1995/03]
15.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.1998Fee for grant paid
24.06.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.06.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199604   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.1996
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE23.09.1998
ES23.09.1998
FR23.09.1998
IT23.09.1998
DE24.12.1998
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]BE23.09.1998
ES23.09.1998
FR23.09.1998
DE24.12.1998
Former [2002/26]BE23.09.1998
ES23.09.1998
DE24.12.1998
FR19.02.1999
Former [1999/36]BE23.09.1998
DE24.12.1998
FR19.02.1999
Former [1999/30]BE23.09.1998
DE24.12.1998
Former [1999/27]BE23.09.1998
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0369670  (STRACHAN-ASPDEN);
 [A]JPH02128480
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900806), vol. 14, no. 362, Database accession no. (E - 0960), & JP02128480 A 19900516 (NEC) [A] * abstract *
International search[XY]US3116427  ;
 [XY]US3259759  ;
 [XY]US3356864  ;
 [Y]US4004210  ;
 [Y]US4663115  ;
 [Y]US4106952  ;
 [A]US3243687  ;
 [A]US4019113  ;
 [A]US3419767  ;
 [A]US3460008  ;
 [A]US3495141  ;
 [A]US3890161
 [XY]  - Physical Review A, Vol. 26, No. 5, November 1982, JOSEPH C. YATER, "Particle Interactions in the Power Conversion of Energy Fluctuations", pp. 2954-2967, see entire document.
 [XY]  - Physical Review A, Vol. 26, No. 1, July 1982, JOSEPH C. YATER, "Physical Basis of Power Conversion of Energy Fluctuations", pp. 522-538, see entire document.
 [A]  - Physical Review A, Vol. 10, No. 4, October 1974, JOSEPH C. YATER, "Power Conversion of Energy Fluctuations", pp. 1361-1369.
 [A]  - Physical Review A, Vol. 20, No. 2, August 1979, JOSEPH C. YATER, "Rebuttal to Comments on Power Conversion of Energy Fluctuations", pp. 623-627.
 [A]  - Solar Cells, Vol. 10, August 1993, JOSEPH C. YATER, "Physical Basis of Power Conversion of Energy Fluctuations of Hot Electronics", pp. 237-255.
 [A]  - Physical Review B, Vol. 12, No. 10, 15 November 1975, R.C. JAKLEVIC and JOHN LAMBE, "Experimental Study of Quantum Size Effects in Thin Metal Films by Electron Tunneling", pp. 4146-4160.
 [A]  - Physics Today, February 1990, FREDERICO CAPASSO and SUPRIYO DATTA, "Quantum Electron Devices", pp. 74-82.
 [A]  - Physical Review A, Vol. 20, No. 4, October 1979, JOSEPH C. YATER, "Relation of the Second Law of Thermodynamics to the Power Conversion of Energy Fluctuations", pp. 1614-1618.