Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0643787

EP0643787 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING AND USING A DRILLING APPARATUS OR A CRANE APPARATUS FROM A SINGLE MOVABLE VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROWAN COMPANIES, INC.
5450 Transco Tower, 2800 Post Oak Boulevard
Houston, TX 77056-6111 / US
[1995/12]
Inventor(s)01 / MCNEASE, Daniel, F.
22711 Laurelwood Lane
Tomball, TX 78375 / US
[1995/12]
Representative(s)Deans, Michael John Percy
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/12]Deans, Michael John Percy
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R OAE / GB
Application number, filing date93909474.406.04.1993
[1995/12]
WO1993US03159
Priority number, dateUS1992086394506.04.1992         Original published format: US 863945
[1995/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9320289
Date:14.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0643787
Date:22.03.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993
[1995/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643787
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.10.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:E02B17/00
[1995/12]
Designated contracting statesGB,   NL [1995/12]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN TRANSPORT UND GEBRAUCH EINER BOHRVORRICHTUNG ODER EINES KRANS VON EINEM EINZIGEN VERFAHRBAREN FAHRZEUG[1995/12]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING AND USING A DRILLING APPARATUS OR A CRANE APPARATUS FROM A SINGLE MOVABLE VESSEL[1995/12]
French:PROCEDE ET EQUIPEMENT CONCERNANT LE TRANSPORT ET L'UTILISATION D'UNE INSTALLATION DE FORAGE OU D'UNE GRUE AVEC UNE SEULE PLATE-FORME[1995/12]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1994National basic fee paid 
04.11.1994Search fee paid 
04.11.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.11.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/12]
15.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2002Fee for grant paid
09.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4103503  (SMITH MARVIN L);
 [Y]US4456404  (EVANS DARRELL L [US]);
 [Y]US4729695  (SILVESTRI ANTONIO [IT]);
 [A]US4973198  (COX BOBBY E [US]);
 [A]FR1214760  (BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM)