Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0662378

EP0662378 - METHOD OF FORMING PATTERNS ON CONCRETE SURFACE AND DECORATION MAT USED FOR THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama Komaki-shi
Aichi 485 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
3600, Aza-Utazu Oaza-Kitatoyama
Komaki-shi Aichi 485 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IWAYA, Nobuo
12-8, Momogaokai-chome
Komaki-shi, Aichi 485 / JP
[1995/28]
Representative(s)Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date93910345.317.05.1993
[1995/28]
WO1993JP00642
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9426489
Date:24.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0662378
Date:12.07.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994
[1995/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0662378
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.11.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:B28B1/14
[1995/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [1995/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DEKORATIONEN AUF BETONOBERFLÄCHEN UND DEKORATIONSMATTE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DIESEM VERFAHREN[1999/22]
English:METHOD OF FORMING PATTERNS ON CONCRETE SURFACE AND DECORATION MAT USED FOR THE METHOD[1995/28]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES MOTIFS SUR UNE SURFACE DE BETON ET MATTE DE DECORATION UTILISEE POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LE PROCEDE[1999/22]
Former [1995/28]VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON DEKORATIONEN AUF BETONOBERFLACHEN UND DEKORATIONSMATTE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DIESEM VERFAHREN
Former [1995/28]PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES MOTIFS SUR UNE SURFACE DE BETON ET MATTE DE DECORATION UTILISE POUR METTRE EN UVRE LE PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase16.02.1995Translation filed 
16.02.1995National basic fee paid 
16.02.1995Search fee paid 
16.02.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/28]
25.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0080260  (JOHNSTON ROY GRANITE STEWART [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 5; figure 2 *;
 [XY]US3737511  (DILLON T) [X] 1,3 * column W * [Y] 2,4;
 [XY]DE1282540  (DISBON GES M B H CHEMISCHE ERZ) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4;
 [XY]US3390496  (WEINER ALBERT D, et al) [X] 1,3 * column W * [Y] 2,4;
 [YA]US3496264  (GRANT LEMUEL P) [Y] 2,4 * column W * [A] 1,3;
 [Y]DE3733707  (STEIN BECKER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,4 * figures 1-4 *;
 [E]FR2684926  (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [E]JPH0671623  ;
 [E]EP0594303  (SUGAWARA IND [JP], et al) [E] 1,3 * the whole document *
 [E]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940616), vol. 18, no. 317, Database accession no. (M - 1622), [E] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPS5339315  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPH01259902  (KINUGAWA TEKKOSHO KK)