blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0643553

EP0643553 - PARTICLE TRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SINVENT A/S
N-7034 Trondheim / NO
[1995/12]
Inventor(s)01 / LUNDE, Trygve
Lauvsangerveien 1
N-7022 Trondheim / NO
02 / SKYBAKMOEN, Steinar
Nordslettveien 177
N-7038 Trondheim / NO
03 / SCHEI, Idar
Tankveien 13A
N-7046 Trondheim / NO
[1995/12]
Representative(s)Dealtry, Brian
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/12]Dealtry, Brian
Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date93910448.525.05.1993
[1995/12]
WO1993NO00081
Priority number, dateNO1992000216401.06.1992         Original published format: NO 922164
NO1992000216501.06.1992         Original published format: NO 922165
[1995/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9323994
Date:09.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0643553
Date:22.03.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643553
Date:26.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0643553
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE09.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:A01K63/04
[1995/12]
CPC:
A01K63/04 (EP,KR,US); A01K63/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/12]
TitleGerman:PARTIKELFALLE[1995/12]
English:PARTICLE TRAP[1995/12]
French:PIEGE A PARTICULES[1995/12]
Entry into regional phase18.11.1994National basic fee paid 
18.11.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
18.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/12]
01.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.11.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.1998Fee for grant paid
23.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.05.1999    ADMISSIBLE
NOVATION LIMITED
Avon House 19a, Spital Road
Maldon, Essex CM9 6DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Loven, Keith James
Loven
Patents & Trademarks
West Central
Runcorn Road
Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1999/29]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.1999    ADMISSIBLE
NOVATION LIMITED
Whellwrights, Head Street
Goldhanger, Essex CM9 8AY / GB
Opponent's representative
Loven, Keith James
Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street
Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB
30.06.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.01.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.03.2001Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.03.2001Date of oral proceedings
27.04.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.04.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.09.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
17.12.2001Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2241857  (GODDIN JEREMY ROBERT);
 [A]NO160753B  (KNUTSEN R W)
OppositionGB2242140
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.