Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0637229

EP0637229 - DEVICES FOR PREVENTING TISSUE ADHESION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chienna B.V.
Prof. Bronkhorstlaan 10 D
3723 MB Bilthoven / NL
[2003/02]
Former [1995/06]For all designated states
OSTEOTECH, INC.
1151E Shrewsbury Avenue
Shrewsbury New Jersey 07702 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAKKER, Dirkjan
Leerhoevestraat 26
NL-2406 Alphen a/d Rijn / NL
02 / BAKKUM, Erika, Anna
Houtmarkt 29
NL-2011 AL Haarlem / NL
03 / VAN BLITTERSWIJK, Clemens, Antoni
Hekendorpsebuurt 2
NL-3467 PD Heckendorp / NL
[1995/06]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/28]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Former [1995/06]Segeth, Wolfgang
Patentanwälte Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz & Segeth Postfach 30 55
D-90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date93910809.820.04.1993
[1995/06]
WO1993US03905
Priority number, dateUS1992087344124.04.1992         Original published format: US 873441
[1995/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9321858
Date:11.11.1993
Language:EN
[1993/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0637229
Date:08.02.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993
[1995/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0637229
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.11.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/02, B32B27/08, A61L31/00
[1998/45]
Former International [1995/06]A61F2/02, B32B27/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/06]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERMEIDEN VON GEWEBEADHÄSIONEN[1995/06]
English:DEVICES FOR PREVENTING TISSUE ADHESION[1995/06]
French:DISPOSITIFS SERVANT A EMPECHER L'ADHERENCE DE TISSUS[1995/06]
Entry into regional phase19.10.1994National basic fee paid 
19.10.1994Search fee paid 
19.10.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
19.10.1994Examination requested  [1995/06]
15.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2002Fee for grant paid
18.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
IE21.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
[2015/21]
Former [2007/16]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
IE21.04.2003
LU30.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
Former [2005/02]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
IE21.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
Former [2004/29]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
IE21.04.2003
Former [2004/02]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
DE21.02.2003
Former [2003/39]AT20.11.2002
CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE20.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[YP]WO9210218  (GORE & ASS [US]) [YP] 1-40 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 7 *;
 [YD]  - D.K. GILDING AND A.M. REED, "Biodegradable polymers for use in surgery-poly(ethylene oxide) poly(ethylene terephthalate) (PEO/PET) copolymers: 1", POLYMER, Guildford (GB), (197909), vol. 20, pages 1454 - 1458, XP002076603 [YD] 1-40 * page 1454, column R, paragraph 2 *
International search[A]US5066772  (TANG REGINALD T [US], et al)