EP0639114 - CONTAINER AND CLOSURE SYSTEM FOR MAINTAINING STABILITY OF SODIUM HYPOCHLORITE SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd. P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | ||
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL, INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLFANGEL, Robert, G. 1104 Grenadier Lane Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93911082.1 | 05.05.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993US04252 | Priority number, date | US19920878633 | 06.05.1992 Original published format: US 878633 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322056 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639114 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639114 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
C01B11/062 (EP);
B65D51/002 (EP);
A61J1/1468 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER UND VERSCHLUSS ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DER STABILITÄT VON NATRIUMHYPOCHLORITLÖSUNGEN | [1999/25] | English: | CONTAINER AND CLOSURE SYSTEM FOR MAINTAINING STABILITY OF SODIUM HYPOCHLORITE SOLUTIONS | [1995/08] | French: | SYSTEME DE RECIPIENT ET DE FERMETURE DESTINE A MAINTENIR LA STABILITE DE SOLUTIONS D'HYPOCHLORITE DE SODIUM | [1995/08] |
Former [1995/08] | BEHÄLTER UND VERSCHLUSS ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DER STABILITÄT VON KOCHSALZLÖSUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2000 | BE | 09.08.2000 | CH | 09.08.2000 | ES | 09.08.2000 | GR | 09.08.2000 | IT | 09.08.2000 | LI | 09.08.2000 | DK | 09.11.2000 | PT | 09.11.2000 | SE | 09.11.2000 | IE | 07.05.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
GR | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
DK | 09.11.2000 | ||
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
IE | 07.05.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
DK | 09.11.2000 | ||
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
IE | 07.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
IE | 07.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
BE | 09.08.2000 | ||
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
PT | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 09.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4614276 (IHARA KIYOHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 4, line 50 - line 58; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0294127 (DAIKYO GOMU SEIKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 28; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9002150 (HELVOET PHARMA [BE]) [X] 1-11* page 8, line 14 - page 11, line 22; figure 1 * | International search | [XY]US4888172 (SZEBENYI EMIL [US], et al); | [A]US4999375 (BACHYNSKY MARIA O [US], et al) | [XY] - Scientific Products General Catalog-Baxter, 1991-1992, pages 455 and 458-459, see entire document. | [Y] - Aldrich Catalog-Aldrich Chemical Company, Inc., 1988, pages 1347 and 1853-1856, see entire document. |