Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0642558

EP0642558 - CATALYZED CATIONIC PAINT BINDERS, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION, AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/11]CATALYZED CATIONIC LACQUER BINDER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND ITS USE
[1996/39]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solutia Austria GmbH
8402 Werndorf / AT
[2001/42]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
Vianova Resins AG
A-8402 Werndorf / AT
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
Vianova Kunstharz Aktiengesellschaft
Bundesstrasse 175
A-8402 Werndorf / AT
Inventor(s)01 / SCHIPFER, Rudolf
Ernst Haeckelstrasse 53
A-8010 Graz / AT
02 / SCHMÖLZER, Gerhard
Eisteichgasse 37
A-8010 Graz / AT
03 / URBANO, Edmund
Tannhofweg 12
A-8044 Graz / AT
[1995/11]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2001/42]
Former [2001/12]Leifert, Elmar, Dr.
Leifert & Steffan, Burgplatz 21/22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/18]Leifert, Elmar, Dr. , et al
Böhm Rauch Schumacher Krämer & Leifert Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1999/03]Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentsanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1998/46]Leifert, Elmar, Dr. , et al
Böhm Rauch Schumacher Krämer & Leifert Burgplatz 21-22
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1997/47]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date93912386.527.05.1993
[1995/11]
WO1993AT00091
Priority number, dateAT1992000112229.05.1992         Original published format: AT 112292
AT1992000257124.12.1992         Original published format: AT 257192
[1995/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9324578
Date:09.12.1993
Language:DE
[1993/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0642558
Date:15.03.1995
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0642558
Date:25.09.1996
Language:DE
[1996/39]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0642558
Date:24.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1993
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/44, C09D5/02, C08K5/09, C08G59/40
[1995/11]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/11]
TitleGerman:KATALYSIERTE KATIONISCHE LACKBINDEMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[1995/11]
English:CATALYZED CATIONIC PAINT BINDERS, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION, AND THEIR USE[1996/39]
French:LIANTS DE PEINTURES CATIONIQUES CATALYSES, LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION[1996/39]
Former [1995/11]CATALYZED CATIONIC LACQUER BINDER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND ITS USE
Former [1995/11]LIANT VERNIS CATIONIQUE CATALYSE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase02.11.1994National basic fee paid 
02.11.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/11]
08.12.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.03.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.1996Fee for grant paid
19.04.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.06.1997  11.07.1997  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings AG
CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Münch, Volker, et al
Dres. Fitzner & Münch
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Hauser Ring 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1998/18]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.1997  11.07.1997  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings AG
CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Münch, Volker, et al
Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [1997/33]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.1997  11.07.1997  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Lacke + Farben AG
Patente/Lizenzen/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23
D-48136 Münster / DE
01.08.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.11.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.05.1998Date of oral proceedings
29.05.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.05.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.03.2001Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.05.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.08.2001Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition29.07.1998Appeal received No.  T0777/98
09.10.1998Statement of grounds filed
08.05.2001Interlocutory revision of appeal
08.05.2001Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
30.03.2001Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
04.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0264834  (NIPPON PAINT) [AD] 1 * claims 1,3 *
OppositionEP0509437
 EP0337422
 DE2541234