Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0642558 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0642558



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 365
13.09.2001 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.09.2001 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.09.2001 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
30.08.2001 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
30.08.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
20.08.2001 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
20.08.2001 Request for change of name of the applicant Opposition 7
20.08.2001 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
20.08.2001 Translation of the claims Opposition 2
17.05.2001 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
17.05.2001 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
17.05.2001 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
08.05.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.05.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.05.2001 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
06.04.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
06.04.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.03.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.03.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.03.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.03.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.03.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.03.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.03.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
30.03.2001 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
30.03.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.02.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.02.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
23.02.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.02.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.02.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.02.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.02.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
16.02.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
06.02.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
01.02.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.01.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
12.01.2001 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
12.01.2001 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
09.01.2001 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
20.12.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.12.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.12.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.12.2000 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.12.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
14.12.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
14.12.2000 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
11.12.2000 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.12.2000 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.12.2000 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.10.2000 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
22.08.2000 General enquiry Appeal 1
26.04.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.04.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
31.03.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.03.1999 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
22.03.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
22.03.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
22.03.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
22.03.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
22.03.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.03.1999 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
06.03.1999 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
08.12.1998 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
08.12.1998 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 1
08.12.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.12.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
08.12.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.11.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.11.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.11.1998 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
17.11.1998 General authorisation Appeal 1
17.11.1998 General authorisation Search / examination 1
17.10.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.10.1998 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 1
15.10.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.10.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
28.09.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.1998 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 1
25.09.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.09.1998 Request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
10.09.1998 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
10.09.1998 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
07.09.1998 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
03.09.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.09.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
31.08.1998 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.07.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.06.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.06.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.05.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
29.05.1998 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
29.05.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
29.05.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.1998 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.1998 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.1998 Text intended for grant Opposition 10
14.05.1998 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
30.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.03.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.03.1998 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
07.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
03.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
03.02.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.01.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.01.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
13.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.11.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Claims Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Claims Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
10.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.10.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.09.1997 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
16.09.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.08.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
01.08.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.07.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.07.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.07.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.06.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.06.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.08.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.04.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.04.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.04.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.03.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 5
28.02.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
17.02.1996 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.02.1996 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 5
08.12.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
08.12.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
08.11.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
22.11.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.11.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1994 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.10.1994 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
28.02.1994 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
28.02.1994 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
09.02.1994 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
31.01.1994 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
31.01.1994 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.01.1994 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.12.1993 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 22
09.12.1993 Priority document Search / examination 34