Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0643556

EP0643556 - FORMULATIONS, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE CONTROLLED GENERATION OF PHOSPHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
Former [1995/12]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / WATERFORD, Colin Joseph
58 Pulleine Crescent
McGregor, ACT 2615 / AU
02 / WHITTLE, Christopher Playford
9 Whitham Place
Pearce, ACT 2607 / AU
03 / WINKS, Robert Gordon
5B Buntine Crescent
Isaacs, ACT 2607 / AU
[1995/12]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/12]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date93912420.204.06.1993
[1995/12]
WO1993AU00270
Priority number, dateAU1992PL0283005.06.1992         Original published format: AU PL283092
AU1992PL0582116.11.1992         Original published format: AU PL582192
[1995/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9325075
Date:23.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0643556
Date:22.03.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993
[1995/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0643556
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU23.12.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/18, A01N25/04, A01N25/10, A01N59/26, C01B25/06, A01M13/00
[1995/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/12]
TitleGerman:FORMULIERUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR DIE KONTROLLIERTE HERSTELLUNG VON PHOSPHIN[1995/12]
English:FORMULATIONS, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE CONTROLLED GENERATION OF PHOSPHINE[1995/12]
French:FORMULATIONS, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION REGULEE DE PHOSPHINE[1995/12]
Entry into regional phase05.12.1994National basic fee paid 
05.12.1994Search fee paid 
05.12.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
05.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/12]
20.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2000Fee for grant paid
07.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
LU04.06.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
[2005/23]
Former [2003/45]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2002/42]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2002/02]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
IE05.06.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2001/50]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
IE05.06.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2001/26]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2001/16]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
Former [2001/11]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]FR750035  (S.M. PERAUD) [X] 1 * whole document *;
 [X]GB333216  (CHARLES BALL) [X] 1 * claim - *;
 [X]DE880817  (RIEDEL DE HAEN AG) [X] 1 * claim . *
International search[XY]US4863718  (BERNARDO ORLANDO [BR]);
 [Y]US5015475  (KAPP WOLFGANG [DE], et al)