blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0649501

EP0649501 - MICROVALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.12.2000Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.02.2001 [2001/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/42]
Former [1995/17]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / METTNER, Michael
Waliser Str. 4/1
D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE
02 / SCHUELKE, Armin
Im Wolfsgalgen 9
D-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE
03 / DOERING, Christian
Gartenstr. 36
D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE
04 / SCHITTNY, Thomas
Uhlandstr. 18
D-7141 Steinheim / DE
[1995/17]
Application number, filing date93912570.408.06.1993
[1995/17]
WO1993DE00493
Priority number, dateDE1992422108926.06.1992         Original published format: DE 4221089
[1995/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9400696
Date:06.01.1994
Language:DE
[1994/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0649501
Date:26.04.1995
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0649501
Date:14.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.01.1994
ClassificationIPC:F15C5/00
[1995/17]
CPC:
F16K99/0001 (EP,US); F15C5/00 (EP,KR,US); F16K99/0005 (EP,US);
F16K99/0051 (EP,US); F16K2099/0078 (EP,US); F16K2099/008 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0096 (EP,US); F16K99/0034 (EP,US); H01F2007/068 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/17]
TitleGerman:MIKROVENTIL[1995/17]
English:MICROVALVE[1995/17]
French:MICRO-SOUPAPE[1995/17]
Entry into regional phase26.01.1995National basic fee paid 
26.01.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/17]
25.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.12.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.1998Fee for grant paid
16.03.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.07.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB08.06.1999
[2001/07]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9102169  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al);
 [A]DE2034467  (PHILIPS NV);
 [A]DE2039133  (PHILIPS NV);
 [A]FR1395241  (NII TEPLOENERGUETITCHESKOGO PR)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.