Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0641222

EP0641222 - TECHNETIUM-99m LABELED PEPTIDES FOR THROMBUS IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diatide, Inc.
9 Delta Drive
Londonderry, NH 03053 / US
[1996/34]
Former [1995/10]For all designated states
DIATECH, INC.
9 Delta Drive
Londonderry, NH 03053 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEAN, Richard T.
43 King Road
Bedford, NH 03102 / US
02 / LISTER-JAMES, John
25 Old Stone Way
Bedford, NH 03110 / US
[1995/10]
Representative(s)Dörries, Hans Ulrich , et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]Dörries, Hans Ulrich , et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/37]Dörries, Hans Ulrich, Dr. , et al
Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman Postfach 22 16 61
80506 München / DE
Former [1998/28]Frohwitter, Bernhard , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Former [1997/39]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [1995/10]Couchman, Jonathan Hugh , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley, Gate House South, West Gate
Harlow, Essex CM20 1JN / GB
Application number, filing date93914023.221.05.1993
[1995/10]
WO1993US04794
Priority number, dateUS1992088675221.05.1992         Original published format: US 886752
[1995/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9323085
Date:25.11.1993
Language:EN
[1993/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0641222
Date:08.03.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993
[1995/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0641222
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61K51/08
[1999/30]
Former International [1995/10]A61K49/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/10]
TitleGerman:TECHNETIUM-99M MARKIERTE PEPTIDE ZUR BILDERZEUGUNG VON THROMBUS[1995/10]
English:TECHNETIUM-99m LABELED PEPTIDES FOR THROMBUS IMAGING[1995/10]
French:PEPTIDES MARQUES AU TECHNETIUM-99m DESTINES A L'IMAGERIE DE THROMBUS[1995/10]
Entry into regional phase19.12.1994National basic fee paid 
19.12.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/10]
14.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.04.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.12.1999Fee for grant paid
10.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP99124003.7  / EP1004322
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Request for further processing for:17.04.1998Request for further processing filed
15.04.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.06.1998Decision despatched
16.04.1998Request for further processing filed
15.04.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
24.06.1998Decision despatched
31.01.1997Request for further processing filed
31.01.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
14.02.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
06.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9213572  (DIATECH INC [US]);
 [E]WO9310747  (DIATECH INC [US]);
 [X]WO9010463  (NEORX CORP [US]);
 [Y]US4792525  (RUOSLAHTI ERKKI [US], et al);
 [X]WO8910759  (MALLINCKRODT INC [US]);
 [A]EP0163119  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]);
 [X]WO9015818  (ANTISOMA LTD [GB]);
 [A]WO9205154  (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL INC [US]);
 [A]WO9117173  (CYTOGEN CORP [US]);
 [A]WO8902752  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al);
 [A]EP0453082  (HYBRITECH INC [US])
 [A]  - BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY vol. 1, no. 1, 1990, pages 132 - 137 K.E. BAIDOO ET AL. 'SYNTHESIS OF A DIAMINEDITHIOL BIFUNCTIONAL CHELATING AGENT FOR INCORPORATION OF TECHNETIUM-99M INTO BIOMOLECULES',
 [A]  - INORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 29, no. 16, 1990, pages 2948 - 2951 N. BRYSON ET AL. 'PROTECTING GROUPS IN THE PREPARATION OF THIOLATE COMPLEXES OF TECHNETIUM',