blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0672151

EP0672151 - USE OF AN INHIBITOR OF THE PROTEASE ACTIVITY OF A HUMAN ICE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/38]INHIBITORS OF CED-3 AND RELATED PROTEINS
[2006/14]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[1995/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HORVITZ, H., Robert
80 Wndell Street, No. 2
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
02 / YUAN, Junying
22 Fairlee Road
Newton, MA 02168 / US
03 / SHAHAM, Shai
132 Commonwealth Avenue, No. 9
Boston, MA 02116 / US
[1995/38]
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/26]Wallace, Sheila Jane
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [1995/38]Deans, Michael John Percy
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R OAE / GB
Application number, filing date93915351.614.06.1993
[1995/38]
WO1993US05705
Priority number, dateUS1992089778812.06.1992         Original published format: US 897788
US1992098418220.11.1992         Original published format: US 984182
[1995/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9325694
Date:23.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0672151
Date:20.09.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/57, C12N9/64, C12N15/39, A61K31/70, C12Q1/68, G01N33/577, G01N33/68
[2006/27]
CPC:
C12N9/641 (EP,US); A61P17/14 (EP); A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/08 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/43581 (EP,US); C12Q1/6876 (EP,US); A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US); C07K2319/09 (EP,US); C07K2319/50 (EP,US);
C07K2319/61 (EP,US); C07K2319/90 (EP,US); C12Q2600/158 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1995/38]C12N15/57, C12N9/64, C12N15/39, A61K31/70, A61K37/02, C12Q1/68, G01N33/577, G01N33/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/38]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES INHIBITORS DER PROTEASEAKTIVITÄT DER MENSCHLICHEN ICE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIKAMENTS[2006/14]
English:USE OF AN INHIBITOR OF THE PROTEASE ACTIVITY OF A HUMAN ICE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT[2006/14]
French:UTILISATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE L'ACTIVITE DE PROTEASE DU ICE HUMAIN DANS LA FABRICATION D'UN MEDICAMENT[2006/14]
Former [1995/38]INHIBITOREN VON CED-3 UND VERWANDTE PROTEINE
Former [1995/38]INHIBITORS OF CED-3 AND RELATED PROTEINS
Former [1995/38]INHIBITEURS DE CED-3 ET DE PROTEINES APPARENTEES
Entry into regional phase11.01.1995National basic fee paid 
11.01.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
02.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/32]
22.03.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2007/32]
Appeal following examination17.02.2004Appeal received No.  T0669/04
29.04.2004Statement of grounds filed
08.04.2005Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
08.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
14.04.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP05007515.9   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 07.05.2005
EP05075791.3   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 07.05.2005
Request for further processing for:16.02.2001Request for further processing filed
16.02.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 11
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 12
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 13
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XP]CA2076159  ;
 [X]WO9115577  (IMMUNEX CORP [US]);
 [Y]WO9207071  (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]);
 [XP]EP0533350  (MERCK & CO INC [US])
    [ ] - DISSERTATION ABSTRACT INTERNATIONAL B vol. 50, no. 10, April 1990, page 4431-B J. YUAN 'Genetic and molecular studies of ced-3 and ced-4: Two genes that control programmed cell death'
 [Y]  - Dissertation Abstract International B, Vol. 50, no. 10, April 1990, J. Yuan, "Genetic and molecular sudies of ced-3 and ced-4: Two genes that control programmed cell death", page 4431-B
 [X]  - NATURE. vol. 356, 30 April 1992, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD., LONDON, UK. pages 768-774; THORNBERRY N.A. ET AL.. "A novel heterodimeric cystein protease is required for interleukin-1-beta processing in monocytes"
 [X]  - CELL. vol. 69, no. 4, 15 May 1992, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US. pages 597-604; RAY C.A. ET AL.: "Viral inhibition of inflammation: Cowpox virus encodes an inhibitor of the interleukin-1-beta converting enzyme"
 [A]  - ANNUAL REVIEW OF CELL BIOLOGY. vol. 7, 1991, ANNUAL REVIEW INC., PALO ALTO, CA, US. pages 663-698; ELLIS R.E. ET AL.: "Mechanisms and functions of cell death"
 [XP]  - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN. vol. 185, no. 3, 30 June 1992, ACADEMIC PRESS, N.Y., US. pages 1155-1161; KUMAR S. ET AL.: "Identification of a set of genes with developmentally down-regulated expression in the mouse brains"
 [XP]  - DATABASE WPI. Week 9318 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB. AN 93-144400; & CA-A 2076159 (MERCK & CO. INC.) 17 February 1993, & CA2076159 A 00000000
 [YP]  - NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING. vol. 13, 1992, PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, US. page S47, LEDOUX S. ET AL.: "Isolation of nematode homologs of the C. elegans cell death gene ced-3", Third International Conference on Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders, Abano Terme, Italy, July 12-17, 1992; Abstract no. 183
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.