Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0654086

EP0654086 - VACCINES AGAINST AUJESZKY'S DISEASE AND OTHER ANIMAL DISEASES CONTAINING PSEUDORABIES VIRUS MUTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
[2000/03]
Former [1995/21]For all designated states
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PEETERS, Bernardus, Petrus, Hubertus
Karveel 48-04
NL-8242 VK Lelystad / NL
02 / POL, Jan, Maria, Antonius
Jol 30-05
NL-8243 HA Lelystad / NL
03 / GIELKENS, Arnold, Leonard, Josef
Boeier 04-76
NL-8242 CL Lelystad / NL
04 / MOORMANN, Robertus, Jacobus, Maria
De Telgang 12
NL-8252 EH Dronten / NL
[1995/21]
Representative(s)Mestrom, Joannes Jozef Louis , et al
P.O. Box 20
5340 BH Oss / NL
[N/P]
Former [1995/21]Mestrom, Joannes Jozef Louis , et al
P.O. Box 20
NL-5340 BH Oss / NL
Application number, filing date93916297.008.07.1993
[1995/21]
WO1993NL00146
Priority number, dateEP1992020209609.07.1992         Original published format: EP 92202096
[1995/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9401573
Date:20.01.1994
Language:EN
[1994/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0654086
Date:24.05.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994
[1995/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0654086
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.1994
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/86, A61K39/245, C12N7/04
[1995/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/21]
TitleGerman:IMPFSTOFFE GEGEN DIE AUJESKYSKRANKHEIT UND SONSTIGE TIERKRANKHEITEN, DIE PSEUDORABIES VIRUSMUTANTEN ENTHALTEN[1995/21]
English:VACCINES AGAINST AUJESZKY'S DISEASE AND OTHER ANIMAL DISEASES CONTAINING PSEUDORABIES VIRUS MUTANTS[1995/21]
French:VACCINS DIRIGES CONTRE LA MALADIE D'AUJESZKY ET D'AUTRES MALADIES ANIMALES CONTENANT DES MUTANTS DU VIRUS DE LA PSEUDORAGE[1995/21]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1994National basic fee paid 
16.12.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.12.1994Examination requested  [1995/21]
04.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1999Fee for grant paid
02.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
02.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2002/23]SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/09]PT19.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9102795  (STICHTING TECH WETENSCHAPP [NL])
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY vol. 66, no. 2, February 1992, BALTIMORE MD, US pages 894 - 905 B. PEETERS ET AL. 'Pseudorabies virus envelope glycoproteins gp50 and gII are essential for virus penetration, but only gII is involved in membrane fusion.' cited in the application,
 [Y]  - JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY vol. 73, no. PT.2, February 1992, COLCHESTER, GB pages 243 - 251 T. KIMMAN ET AL. 'Contribution of single genes within the the unique short region of Aujeszky's disease virus (suid herpesvirus type 1) to virulence, pathogenesis and immunogenicity.' cited in the application,
 [XP]  - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY vol. 67, no. 1, January 1993, BALTIMORE MD, US pages 170 - 177 B. PEETERS ET AL. 'Envelope glycoprotein gp50 of pseudorabies virus is essential for virus entry but is not required for viral spread in mice.',