Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0666783

EP0666783 - PARTICULATE FEEDSTOCK FOR METAL INJECTION MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thixomat, Inc.
717 E. Huron
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US
[1999/02]
Former [1995/33]For all designated states
COMALCO ALUMINIUM, LTD.
55 Collins Street
Melbourne Victoria 3000 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / KJAR, Anthony R.
23 Laurel Grove
Blackburn, VIC 3130 / AU
02 / IACOCCA, Ronald G.
116 Rhaubert Circle
State College, PA 16801 / US
03 / GERMAN, Randall M.
1145 Outer Drive
State College, PA 16803 / US
04 / MIHELICH, John Louis
6913 Bridgepointe Boulevarde
Prospect, KY 40059 / US
[1995/33]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/33]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date93918800.906.09.1993
[1995/33]
WO1993AU00454
Priority number, dateAU1992PL0463611.09.1992         Original published format: AU PL463692
AU1993PL0968029.06.1993         Original published format: AU PL968093
[1995/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9406586
Date:31.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0666783
Date:16.08.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994
[1995/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0666783
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0666783
Date:15.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU31.03.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B22D23/00, C22B9/16, B22D17/00, // B22D17/10, B22F1/00
[1997/23]
Former International [1995/33]B22D23/00, C22B9/16, // B22D17/10, B22F1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1995/33]
TitleGerman:PULVERMISCHUNG ZUM SPRITZGIESSEN VON METALL[1995/33]
English:PARTICULATE FEEDSTOCK FOR METAL INJECTION MOLDING[1995/33]
French:MATERIAU PARTICULAIRE D'ALIMENTATION POUR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION[1995/33]
Entry into regional phase08.03.1995National basic fee paid 
08.03.1995Search fee paid 
08.03.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
08.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/33]
02.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.1999Fee for grant paid
12.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99201696.4  / EP0960673
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Mannesmann Plastics Machinery AG
Reinhard-von-Frank-Strasse 16
80997 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zollner, Richard
KraussMaffei Group GmbH
Patentabteilung TS
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
 02  12.01.2001   
Norsk Hydro A.S.
-
0240 Oslo/Norway / NO
Opponent's representative
Bleukx, Lucas Lodewijk M.
Bleukx Consultancy BVBA
Derde Straat 7
3680 Maaseik / BE
 03  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Chuo-Kosan Co. Ltd.
Kanmo Building 11-8 1-Chome Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0022 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer, Lutz H.
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/23]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Mannesmann Plastics Machinery AG
Reinhard-von-Frank-Strasse 16
80997 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zollner, Richard
Mannesmann Plastics Machinery AG Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
 02  12.01.2001   
Norsk Hydro A.S.
-
0240 Oslo/Norway / NO
Opponent's representative
Bleukx, Luc
Norsk Hydro Technology B.V., Avenue Marcel Thiry 83
1200 Brussels / BE
 03  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Chuo-Kosan Co. Ltd.
Kanmo Building 11-8 1-Chome Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0022 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys.
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Former [2002/22]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Mannesmann Plastics Machinery AG
Reinhard-von-Frank-Strasse 16
80997 München / DE
 02  12.01.2001   
Norsk Hydro A.S.
-
0240 Oslo/Norway / NO
Opponent's representative
Bleukx, Luc
Norsk Hydro Technology B.V., Avenue Marcel Thiry 83
1200 Brussels / BE
 03  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Chuo-Kosan Co. Ltd.
Kanmo Building 11-8 1-Chome Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0022 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys.
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Former [2001/11]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Mannesmann Plastics Machinery AG
Reinhard-von-Frank-Strasse 4
80997 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Wössner, Gottfried, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner, Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 02  12.01.2001   
Norsk Hydro A.S.
-
0240 Oslo/Norway / NO
Opponent's representative
Bleukx, Luc
Norsk Hydro Technology B.V., Avenue Marcel Thiry 83
1200 Brussels / BE
 03  11.01.2001  25.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Chuo-Kosan Co. Ltd.
Kanmo Building 11-8 1-Chome Nihonbashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0022 / JP
Opponent's representative
Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys.
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
29.01.2001No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
29.01.2001No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
12.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.11.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.11.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.09.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.11.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.01.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition22.11.2002Appeal received No.  T1148/02
28.02.2003Statement of grounds filed
15.09.2005Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
15.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
23.09.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE07.09.2004
FR31.05.2005
IT06.09.2005
[2007/34]
Former [2006/14]SE07.09.2004
FR31.05.2005
Former [2005/23]SE07.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1758656  (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-10 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 18 * * page 6, line 2 - line 19 *;
 [X]US4063942  (LUNDGREN BENGT G S) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 30 * * claims 1,3-5 *
International search[A]US5040589  (BRADLEY NORBERT L [US], et al);
 [A]US4694882  (BUSK ROBERT S [US]);
 [A]US4694881  (BUSK ROBERT S [US])
ExaminationDE3639737
 US3881913
 GB2182063
 US4460407
    - Look-up Table Mesh/Microns,
    - Design Engineering Feb. 1989, page 33,
    - Hoechst Data Sheet "Karbid und Metallurgische Produkte", Sept. 1978,
    - Brochure of Reade Manufacturing Company,
    - Brochure of Reynolds Metals Company,
    - Analysis of Eckart Granules of 12.12.2000,
    - PFEIFER H.: "Grundlagen der Fordertechnik" 1989,
    - MENGES G.: "Einführung in der Kunststoffverarbeitung" 1986,
    - "Granulierung der thermoplastischen Kunststoffen" VDI-Verlag GmbH 1974,
    - JOHANNABER F.: "Kunststoffmaschinenführer" 1992,
    - Brochure from Poudmet,
    - ERICKSON S.: Proceedings 44th Annual World Magnesium Conference, Tokyo, 1987,
    - "Thixomolding" Proceedings 47th Annual World Magnesium Conference, Cannes, France, 1990,
    - KURIHARA K. et al: Japanese language article, pages 255-260, April 1981 and English translation thereof,
    - GHOSH D. et al: Proceedings on the International Symposium on Advances in Production and Fabrication of Light Metals and Metal Matrix Composites, Alberta, August 23-27, 1992,
    - PASTERNAK D. et al: Proceedings of the Second International Conference of the Semi-Solid Processing of Alloys and Composites, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Cambridge, Massachusetts, 1993,
    - PASTERNAK D. et al: Proceedings of the Second International Conference of Semi-Solid Processing of Alloys and Composites, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, June 10-12, 1992,