Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0768837

EP0768837 - DEVICE FOR USE IN SECURING A THREAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON
5 Gower Street
London WC1E 6BT / GB
[2000/20]
Former [1997/17]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON
Gower Street
London WC1E 6BT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SWAIN, Paul
41 Willow Road
London NW3 1TN / GB
02 / GONG, Feng Shropshire House
11-20 Capper Street
London WC1E 6JA / GB
03 / BROWN, Geoffrey, John
32 Len Hall Road
London E10 7AN / GB
04 / MILLS, Timothy, Noel Flat 4
45 Newman Street
London WC1N 3PA / GB
[1997/17]
Representative(s)Boon, Graham Anthony , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/17]Boon, Graham Anthony , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date93919496.503.09.1993
[1997/17]
WO1993GB01860
Priority number, dateGB1992001875404.09.1992         Original published format: GB 9218754
[1997/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9405218
Date:17.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0768837
Date:23.04.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0768837
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[1997/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1997/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR FADENSICHERUNG[1999/31]
English:DEVICE FOR USE IN SECURING A THREAD[1997/17]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR FIXER UN FIL[1999/31]
Former [1997/17]VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANBRINGEN EINES FADENS
Former [1997/17]DISPOSITIF UTILISE POUR FIXER UN FIL
Entry into regional phase30.03.1995National basic fee paid 
30.03.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.1995Examination requested  [1997/17]
14.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2000Fee for grant paid
19.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
SE17.08.2000
[2002/02]
Former [2001/27]AT17.05.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT17.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US4235238  (OGIU HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,10 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 21; figures 13,14 *;
 [X]US4741330  (HAYHURST JOHN O [US]) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 44 - line 59; figures 1,2 *;
 [PX]WO9308747  (NOUAILLE JEAN MARC [FR]) [PX] 1,5 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 2; figure 4 *