blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0610495

EP0610495 - TELEVISION TUNING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis
Indiana 46201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/33]For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
600 North Sherman Drive
Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BADGER, David, Mark
4615 Stansbury Court
Indianapolis, IN 46254 / US
[1994/33]
Representative(s)Wördemann, Hermes
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Postfach 61 04 34
30604 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/33]Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing.
Thomson Consumer Electronics Sales GmbH Postfach 91 13 45
D-30433 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date93921249.430.08.1993
[1994/33]
WO1993US08150
Priority number, dateGB1992001837328.08.1992         Original published format: GB 9218373
[1994/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9406208
Date:17.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0610495
Date:17.08.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0610495
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.1994
ClassificationIPC:H03J1/00
[1994/33]
CPC:
H03J1/0075 (EP); H03J1/005 (EP); H03J3/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/33]
TitleGerman:Abstimmschaltung für Fernsehempfänger[1994/33]
English:TELEVISION TUNING APPARATUS[1994/33]
French:APPAREIL D'ACCORD POUR TELEVISION[1994/33]
Entry into regional phase19.04.1994National basic fee paid 
19.04.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.1994Examination requested  [1994/33]
08.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
16.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.1999Fee for grant paid
22.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Request for further processing for:11.02.1998Request for further processing filed
09.02.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.02.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
19.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US4334323  (MOORE FREDERIC J) [X] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS60194818  ;
 [A]EP0298625  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 19; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860215), vol. 10, no. 39, Database accession no. (E - 381)<2096> , & JP60194818 A 19851003 (ONKYO K.K.) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.