Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0664719

EP0664719 - CATHETER TIP WITH A LOW FRICTION LINING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street
St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB
Former [1995/31]For all designated states
CARDIOVASCULAR IMAGING SYSTEMS, INC.
595 North Pastoria Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEBLER, William E.
840 Baker Street, Apartment A-104
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US
02 / DINH, Viet, P.
3309 So. Woodland Place
Santa Ana, CA 92707 / US
[1995/31]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [1995/31]Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
D-80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date93921418.509.09.1993
[1995/31]
WO1993US08441
Priority number, dateUS1992094517515.09.1992         Original published format: US 945175
[1995/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9406495
Date:31.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0664719
Date:02.08.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994
[1995/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0664719
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.03.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/32, A61M25/00
[1995/38]
Former International [1995/31]A61M5/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/31]
TitleGerman:KATHETERSPRITZE MIT EINEM REIBUNGSFREIEN BELAG[1995/31]
English:CATHETER TIP WITH A LOW FRICTION LINING[1995/31]
French:POINTE DE CATHETER A REVETEMENT ANTI-FROTTEMENT[1995/31]
Entry into regional phase12.04.1995National basic fee paid 
12.04.1995Search fee paid 
12.04.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
12.04.1995Examination requested  [1995/31]
10.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2000Fee for grant paid
02.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199806   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2000
BE15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
GR15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
DK15.02.2001
PT15.02.2001
SE15.02.2001
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]AT15.11.2000
BE15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
DK15.02.2001
PT15.02.2001
SE15.02.2001
Former [2003/08]AT15.11.2000
BE15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
NL15.11.2000
PT15.02.2001
SE15.02.2001
Former [2002/11]AT15.11.2000
BE15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
PT15.02.2001
SE15.02.2001
Former [2002/10]AT15.11.2000
BE15.11.2000
CH15.11.2000
LI15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
Former [2002/02]AT15.11.2000
BE15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
Former [2001/51]AT15.11.2000
SE15.02.2001
Former [2001/37]AT15.11.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US3631848  (MULLER WOLF F) [A] 1,8,11-21 * column W *
International search[XY]US4748982  (HORZEWSKI MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [XY]US5034001  (GARRISON MICHI E [US], et al);
 [Y]US5047045  (ARNEY MICHELLE M [US], et al);
 [Y]US5100381  (BURNS MATTHEW M [US]);
 [A]US5135535  (KRAMER BARRY L [US]);
 [AP]US5156594  (KEITH PETER T [US]);
 [AP]US5180367  (KONTOS STAVROS B [US], et al);
 [YP]US5176698  (BURNS MATTHEW M [US], et al)