Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0618143

EP0618143 - REFILL CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-8531 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136-8531 / JP
Former [1994/40]For all designated states
Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
No. 2-6, Ojima 3-chome, Koto-ku
Tokyo 136 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAZATO, Shinsaku Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
2-6, Ojima 3-chome
Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP
02 / YOKOYAMA, Toshiyuki Yoshino Kogyosho Co., Ltd.
2-6, Ojima 3-chome
Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP
[1994/40]
Representative(s)Chettle, Adrian John
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]Chettle, Adrian John
Withers & Rogers 4, Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date93922633.814.10.1993
[1994/40]
WO1993JP01479
Priority number, dateJP19920078553U16.10.1992         Original published format: JP 7855392 U
JP1992033471915.12.1992         Original published format: JP 33471992
JP1992033472015.12.1992         Original published format: JP 33472092
JP19920086019U15.12.1992         Original published format: JP 8601992 U
JP19920086020U15.12.1992         Original published format: JP 8602092 U
JP19920086021U15.12.1992         Original published format: JP 8602192 U
JP19920086022U15.12.1992         Original published format: JP 8602292 U
JP19920086023U15.12.1992         Original published format: JP 8602392 U
JP1993006074919.03.1993         Original published format: JP 6074993
JP19930028312U28.05.1993         Original published format: JP 2831293 U
JP19930028313U28.05.1993         Original published format: JP 2831393 U
[1994/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9408860
Date:28.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0618143
Date:05.10.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994
[1994/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0618143
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.04.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65D8/18, B65D77/00, B65D37/00, B29C51/08, B29C51/04
[1997/48]
Former International [1994/40]B65D8/18, B65D77/00, B65D37/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1994/40]
TitleGerman:WIEDERBEFÜLLUNGSBEHÄLTER[1999/24]
English:REFILL CONTAINER[1994/40]
French:RECIPIENT POUR RECHARGE[1994/40]
Former [1994/40]WIEDERFÜLLBARER BEHÄLTER
Entry into regional phase13.06.1994Translation filed 
08.07.1994National basic fee paid 
08.07.1994Search fee paid 
08.07.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/40]
30.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4154345  (SWEETHEART PLASTICS INC.) [X] 1,2,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 21,24;
 [YA]US4668175  (COSDEN TECHNOLOGY INC.) [Y] 21,24 * the whole document * [A] 22
International search[Y]JPS5891526U  ;
 [Y]JPS6278629U  ;
 [Y]JPS63105644U  ;
 [Y]JPS63176575U  ;
 [A]JPS63281952