Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0666718

EP0666718 - SHOE WITH CENTRAL BUCKLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.1997
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.07.1997 [1997/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PUMA Aktiengesellschaft Rudolf Dassler Sport
Würzburger Strasse 13
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/33]For all designated states
PUMA Aktiengesellschaft Rudolf Dassler Sport
Würzburger Strasse 13
D-91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HIEBLNGER, Rudolf
Ismaninger Strasse 21
D-81675 München / DE
[1995/33]
Representative(s)Hufnagel, Walter , et al
Bad Brückenauer Strasse 6
90427 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]Hufnagel, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. , et al
Bad Brückenauer Strasse 6
90427 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1995/33]Hufnagel, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. , et al
Dorner & Hufnagel Patentanwälte Bad Brückenauer Str. 19
D-90427 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date93924018.002.11.1993
[1995/33]
WO1993DE01051
Priority number, dateDE19920014848U02.11.1992         Original published format: DE 9214848 U
[1995/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9409664
Date:11.05.1994
Language:DE
[1994/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0666718
Date:16.08.1995
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994
[1995/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0666718
Date:17.07.1996
Language:DE
[1996/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:A43C11/16, A43C11/00
[1995/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1995/33]
TitleGerman:SCHUH MIT ZENTRALVERSCHLUSS[1995/33]
English:SHOE WITH CENTRAL BUCKLE[1995/33]
French:CHAUSSURE MUNIE D'UNE FERMETURE CENTRALE[1995/33]
Entry into regional phase03.01.1995National basic fee paid 
03.01.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.12.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/33]
25.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.01.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.1996Fee for grant paid
26.03.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3919661  (I. OLIVIERI) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2572258  (SALOMON) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2341658  (POLYAIR) [A] 1 * the whole document *