blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0664879

EP0664879 - THERMAL MASS FLOW CONTROLLER HAVING ORTHOGONAL THERMAL MASS FLOW SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIT INSTRUMENTS, INC.
22600 Savi Ranch Parkway
Yorba Linda, CA 92687 / US
[1995/31]
Inventor(s)01 / DOYLE, James, Holohan
2003 Ivy Hill Lane
Orange, CA 92667 / US
02 / DOYLE, Michael, John
10001 Platanal
Villa Park, CA 92667 / US
03 / LEMAY, Dan, Browne
2514 Wilt Road
Fallbrook, CA 92028 / US
04 / VU, Kim, Ngoc
20451 Via Marwah
Yorba Linda, CA 92686 / US
[1995/31]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/33]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al
Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Former [1995/31]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date93924335.815.10.1993
[1995/31]
WO1993US09907
Priority number, dateUS1992096229016.10.1992         Original published format: US 962290
[1995/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9409344
Date:28.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0664879
Date:02.08.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0664879
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.04.1994
ClassificationIPC:G01F5/00, G01F1/68, G05D7/06
[1995/31]
CPC:
G05D7/0635 (EP); G01F5/00 (EP,KR); G01F1/68 (EP);
G01F1/6847 (EP); G01F1/696 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1995/31]
TitleGerman:THERMISCHER MASSENDURCHFLUSSREGLER MIT SENKRECHT ANGEORDNETEM MASSENDURCHFLUSSSENSOR[2000/01]
English:THERMAL MASS FLOW CONTROLLER HAVING ORTHOGONAL THERMAL MASS FLOW SENSOR[1995/31]
French:RéGULATEUR THERMIQUE DE DéBIT MASSIQUE UTILISANT UN CAPTEUR THERMIQUE DE DéBIT MASSIQUE DISPOSé PERPENDICULAIREMENT[2000/01]
Former [1995/31]Thermischer Massendurchflussregler mit senkrecht angeordnetem Massendurchflusssensor
Former [1995/31]Régulateur thermique de débit massique utilisant un capteur thermique de débit massique disposé perpendiculairement
Entry into regional phase03.05.1995National basic fee paid 
03.05.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/31]
26.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1999Fee for grant paid
28.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.199503   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1995
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
[2002/26]
Former [2002/23]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH10.04.2000
LI10.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US5080131  (ONO HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [DX]WO9119959  (UNIT INSTR INC [US]) [DX] 1-7 * page 12, line 24 - page 15, line 23; figure 8 *;
 [A]US4100801  (LEMAY DAN B) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.