Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0669977

EP0669977 - TRANSFORMED ENDOTHELIAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2001 [2001/17]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE  DE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1998/13]For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE  DE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [1998/09]For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE  DE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [1998/06]For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:DE 
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH
Humboldtstrasse 3
D-79539 Lörrach / DE
For:AT 
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
Former [1997/18]For:AT 
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
A-1235 Wien / AT
For:DE 
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH
Humboldtstrasse 3
D-79539 Lörrach / DE
For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [1995/36]For:AT 
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
A-1235 Wien / AT
For:DE 
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH
Humboldtstrasse 3
D-79539 Lörrach / DE
For:BE  CH  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
SANDOZ LTD.
Lichtstrasse 35
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BACH, Fritz, H.
8 Blossom Lane
Manchester-by-the-Sea, MA 01944 / US
02 / DE MARTIN, Rainer
Schlöglgasse 38/8
A-1120 Vienna / AT
[1995/36]
Application number, filing date93924544.529.10.1993
[1995/36]
WO1993EP03015
Priority number, dateGB1992002293102.11.1992         Original published format: GB 9222931
[1995/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9410305
Date:11.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0669977
Date:06.09.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994
[1995/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0669977
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, A61K48/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/85, C12N15/86, A61K38/17, A01K67/027
[1999/17]
Former International [1995/36]C12N15/12, A61K48/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/85, C12N15/86, A61K37/02, A01K67/027
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/36]
TitleGerman:TRANSFORMIERTE ENDOTHELZELLEN[1995/36]
English:TRANSFORMED ENDOTHELIAL CELLS[1995/36]
French:CELLULES ENDOTHELIALES TRANSFORMEES[1995/36]
Entry into regional phase31.05.1995National basic fee paid 
31.05.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/36]
14.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9207573  (SOMATIX THERAPY CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12,23-26,31 * example 6 *;
 [A]WO8908147  (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US]) [A] 13-22,27-30 * examples 5,6; claim 10 *
 [XD]  - HASKILL ET AL., "Characterization of an immediate-early gene induced in adherent monocytes that encodes IkappaB-like activity", CELL., CAMBRIDGE, NA US, (19910628), vol. 65, pages 1281 - 1289, [XD] 13,14,27,28 * figure 1 *
 [PX]  - DE MARTIN ET AL., "Cytokine-inducible expression in endothelial cells of an IkappaBalfa-like gene is regulated by NFkappaB", EMBO JOURNAL., EYNSHAM, OXFORD GB, (19930701), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 2773 - 2779, [PX] 1-7,13-31 * the whole document *