Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0620913

EP0620913 - METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR DOSING SMALL AMOUNTS OF LIQUID QUANTITATIVELY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FLUILOGIC SYSTEMS OY
Revontulentie 8 C
SF-02100 Espoo / FI
[1994/43]
Inventor(s)01 / TUOMINEN, Pertti
Keskiyöntie 26 A 3
FIN-02210 Espoo / FI
02 / KAARTINEN, Niilo
Vuolahti
FIN-21620 Kuusisto / FI
03 / OKKONEN, Unto
Sepänkyläntie 12 B 7
FIN-02430 Masala / FI
[1994/43]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/48]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Former [1994/43]Shackleton, Nicola , et al
Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date93924616.105.11.1993
[1994/43]
WO1993FI00451
Priority number, dateFI1992000502506.11.1992         Original published format: FI 925025
[1994/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9411710
Date:26.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0620913
Date:26.10.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994
[1994/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0620913
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE26.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:G01F11/08, G01N1/14, F04B43/00, B01L3/02
[1994/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DOSIERUNG KLEINER FLÜSSIGKEITSMENGEN[1994/43]
English:METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR DOSING SMALL AMOUNTS OF LIQUID QUANTITATIVELY[1994/43]
French:PROCEDE ET EQUIPEMENT POUR FOURNIR DE PETITES QUANTITES MESUREES DE LIQUIDE[1994/43]
Entry into regional phase07.07.1994National basic fee paid 
07.07.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/43]
02.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2000Fee for grant paid
26.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
IT03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2003/45]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2003/08]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2002/26]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2002/02]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
CH03.05.2000
LI03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE3537737  (MICHEL HORST WERNER);
 [Y]US3319830  (WARD WALLACE W);
 [A]DE1498969  (SANDOZ AG);
 [A]US3382811  (CHASTANG PELHAM D, et al);
 [A]US4887473  (PRONI OSCAR [US], et al);
 [A]DE2447646  (MICHEL HORST WERNER ING GRAD)