Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0669128

EP0669128 - SUSTAINED-RELEASE MICROSPHERE CONTAINING ANTIPSYCHOTIC AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003Revocation of patentpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation
6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0046 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Pharma Corporation
6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
Welfide Corporation
6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP
Former [1995/35]For all designated states
YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KINO, Shigemi, Yoshitomi Pharmaceutical Ind. Ltd.
Pharmac. Lab., 955, Oaza-koiwai, Yoshitomimachi
Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871 / JP
02 / OSAJIMA, Tomonori, Yoshitomi Pharmac. Ind. Ltd.
Pharmac. Lab., 955, Oaza-koiwai, Yoshitomimachi
Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871 / JP
03 / MIZUTA, Hiroaki, Yoshitomi Pharmaceutical Ind. Ltd
Pharmac. Lab., 955, Oaza-koiwai, Yoshitomimachi
Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871 / JP
[1995/35]
Representative(s)Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/35]Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London, EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date93924827.415.11.1993
[1995/35]
WO1993JP01673
Priority number, dateJP1992033244117.11.1992         Original published format: JP 33244192
[1995/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9410982
Date:26.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0669128
Date:30.08.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994
[1995/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0669128
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.05.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/16, A61K31/445
[1995/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/35]
TitleGerman:EIN ANTIPSYCHOTIKUM ENTHALTENDE MIKROKUGEL ZUR VERZÖGERTEN FREISETZUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG[1995/35]
English:SUSTAINED-RELEASE MICROSPHERE CONTAINING ANTIPSYCHOTIC AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME[1995/35]
French:MICROSPHERE A LIBERATION PROLONGEE CONTENANT UN ANTIPSHYCHOTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[1995/35]
Entry into regional phase24.04.1995Translation filed 
24.04.1995National basic fee paid 
24.04.1995Search fee paid 
24.04.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.06.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
24.04.1995Examination requested  [1995/35]
28.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.1999Fee for grant paid
25.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.10.2000  25.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis IN 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
Fisher, Adrian John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 02  05.10.2000  16.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Opponent's representative
Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
 03  05.10.2000  25.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Alkermes, Inc.
64 Sidney Street
Cambridge, Massachusetts / US
Opponent's representative
Chapman, Paul William
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2000/48]
Opponent(s)01  05.10.2000   
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis Indiana, 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
Fisher, Adrian John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
 02  05.10.2000   
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Opponent's representative
Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
 03  05.10.2000   
Alkermes, Inc.
64 Sidney Street
Cambridge, Massachusetts / US
Opponent's representative
Chapman, Paul William
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
25.01.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.07.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.02.2003Date of oral proceedings
12.02.2003Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/30]
24.02.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.02.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE15.11.2000
MC30.11.2000
[2002/42]
Former [2002/17]IE15.11.2000
Former [2002/02]IE08.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19921214), vol. 117, no. 24, Database accession no. 239653, XP002009017 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract *
    [ ] - Z. RAMTOOLA ET AL., "RELEASE KINETICS OF FLUPHENAZINE FROM BIODEGRADABLE MICROSPHERES", J. MICROENCAPSULATION, (1992), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 415 - 423, XP000296311
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850506), vol. 102, no. 18, Database accession no. 154676, XP002009018 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract *
    [ ] - K. SUZUKI ET AL., "MICROENCAPSULATION AND DISSOLUTION PROPERTIES OF A NEUROLEPTIC IN A BIODEGRADABLE POLYMER,POLY (D,L-LACTIDE)", J. PHARM. SCI., (1985), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 21 - 24
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870209), vol. 106, no. 6, Database accession no. 38375, XP002009019 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract *
    [ ] - R. K. CHANG ET AL., "DISSOLUTION CHARACTERISTICS OF POLYCAPROLACTONE-POLYLACTIDE MICROSPHERES OF CHLORPROMAZINE", DRUG DEV. IND. PHARM., (1986), vol. 12, no. 14, pages 2355 - 2380
International search[Y]JPS63122620  ;
 [A]JPS568318  ;
 [A]JPS59130211
ExaminationEP0269921