Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0619887

EP0619887 - A METHOD FOR DISPLAYING A VOLUME OF DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTERN ATLAS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
10205 Westheimer Road
Houston, TX 77042-3115 / US
[1994/42]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAMBERS, Ronald, E.
12635 Ashford Pine
Houston, TX 77082 / US
[1994/42]
Representative(s)Godsill, John Kenneth , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/42]Godsill, John Kenneth , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date93924911.605.10.1993
[1994/42]
WO1993US09446
Priority number, dateUS1992095679305.10.1992         Original published format: US 956793
[1994/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9408256
Date:14.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0619887
Date:19.10.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994
[1994/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0619887
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.04.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:G01V1/28, G01V1/34
[1997/21]
Former International [1994/42]G01V1/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE EINER MENGE VON DATEN[1998/32]
English:A METHOD FOR DISPLAYING A VOLUME OF DATA[1994/42]
French:PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE DONNEES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES[1994/42]
Former [1994/42]VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGUNG EINER MENGE VON DATEN
Entry into regional phase28.06.1994National basic fee paid 
28.06.1994Search fee paid 
28.06.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/42]
21.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL05.01.2000
DE06.04.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2002/11]DE06.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0228231  (CONOCO INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 59 * * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 56 *;
 [A]GB2168152  (AMOCO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - line 30 *;
 [PA]WO9301508  (LANDMARK GRAPHICS CORP [US]) [PA] 1-8 * abstract *
 [Y]  TANER MT ET AL, "Complex seismic trace analysis", GEOPHYSICS, (19790601), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 1041 - 1063, XP002028516 [Y] 1-8 * page 1041 - page 1041; figures 3-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1440994
International search[Y]US4964097  (WANG SHEIN S [US], et al);
 [Y]US5046504  (ALBERT DAVID E [US], et al);
 [Y]US5211179  (HABERL RALPH [DE], et al);
 [YP]US5092341  (KELEN GEORGE J [US]);
 [A]US4633402  (FLINCHBAUGH BRUCE E [US]);
 [YP]US5235556  (MONK DAVID J [US], et al);
 [YE]US5251184  (HILDEBRAND HAROLD A [US], et al);
 [A]US4241429  (BLOOMQUIST MARVIN G [US], et al);
 [AP]US5214613  (ESMERSOY CENGIZ [US])
 [Y]  - Encyclopedic Dictionary of Exploration Geophysics (3d ed.), 1991, ROBERT E. SHERIFF, pages 47-48.,