Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0666789

EP0666789 - MOLD INSERT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PLEASANT, Ronald, E.
13191 Township Road 184
Kenton, OH 43326 / US
[1995/33]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1995/33]
Representative(s)Lerwill, John , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/33]Lerwill, John , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London, WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date93925025.425.10.1993
[1995/33]
WO1993US10185
Priority number, dateUS1992096681326.10.1992         Original published format: US 966813
[1995/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9409961
Date:11.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0666789
Date:16.08.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994
[1995/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0666789
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.05.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:B29C33/38, B29C33/04, B29C45/73
[1995/49]
Former International [1995/33]B29C33/38
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/33]
TitleGerman:FORMEINSATZ UND SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[1995/33]
English:MOLD INSERT AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[1995/33]
French:NOYAU DE MOULE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1995/33]
Entry into regional phase01.05.1995National basic fee paid 
01.05.1995Search fee paid 
01.05.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
01.05.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/33]
20.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.11.1998Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
19.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
31.08.1999Fee for grant paid
31.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Request for further processing for:30.08.1999Request for further processing filed
31.08.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.09.1999Decision despatched
28.01.1999Request for further processing filed
28.01.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
19.02.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199806   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH05.01.2000
IT05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2003/08]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2002/23]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/09]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2000/52]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH10.04.2000
LI10.04.2000
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4828479
 [Y]US793895
 [A]US5116450