Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0673217

EP0673217 - LATERAL ROTATION THERAPY MATTRESS SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.1999
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEOMARINE SYSTEMS, INC.
2 Commerce Drive
Carmel, NY 10512 / US
[1995/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BODINE, Olivier H., Jr.
Philipse Brook Road
Garrison, NY 10524 / US
02 / WILKERSON, Jack
RD 4, Box 352
Pleasant, NY 12569 / US
[1995/39]
Representative(s)Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/39]Blatchford, William Michael , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date93925128.629.10.1993
[1995/39]
WO1993US10421
Priority number, dateUS1992096844129.10.1992         Original published format: US 968441
[1995/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9409686
Date:11.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0673217
Date:27.09.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994
[1995/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0673217
Date:27.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.05.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:A47C27/10, A61G7/00
[1996/22]
Former International [1995/39]A47C27/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [1995/39]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE MATRATZE ZUR BEHANDLUNG DURCH SEITLICHES DREHEN[1995/39]
English:LATERAL ROTATION THERAPY MATTRESS SYSTEM AND METHOD[1995/39]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE CONCERNANT UN MATELAS DE THERAPIE A ROTATION LATERALE[1995/39]
Entry into regional phase20.05.1995National basic fee paid 
20.05.1995Search fee paid 
20.05.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/39]
24.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.1998Fee for grant paid
06.03.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES27.05.1998
DK27.08.1998
SE27.08.1998
[2003/45]
Former [2002/26]ES27.05.1998
SE27.08.1998
Former [1998/47]SE27.08.1998
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5121512  ;
 [A]US5142720  ;
 [A]US5092007  ;
 [A]US4947500