Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0641330

EP0641330 - GABA AND L-GLUTAMIC ACID ANALOGS FOR ANTISEIZURE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Northwestern University
633 Clark Street Evanston
Illinois 60208-1111 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/10]For all designated states
NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY
633 Clark Street
Evanston Illinois 60208-1111 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SILVERMAN, Richard, B.
7817 Beckwith Road
Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US
02 / ANDRUSZKIEWICZ, Ryszard
ul. Kolberga 14C M27
81-881 Sopot / PL
03 / YUEN, Po-Wai
2178 Maple Creek Circle
Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US
 [2001/37]
Former [1995/10]01 / SILVERMAN, Richard, B.
7817 Beckwith Road
Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US
02 / ANDRUSZKIEWICZ, Ryszard
ul. Kolberga 14C M27
81-881 Sopot / PL
03 / YUEN, Po-Wai
2178 Maple Creek Circle
Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US
04 / SOBIERAY, Denis, Martin
2178 South Bristol
Holland, MI 49424 / US
05 / FRANKLIN, Lloyd, Charles
4391 137th Avenue
Hamilton, MI 49419 / US
06 / SCHWINDT, Mark, Alan
10443 Hunters Creek
Holland, MI 49424 / US
Representative(s)Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Tower North Central
Merrion Way
Leeds
LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Former [2001/04]Austin, Hedley William
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road
Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Former [1995/10]Wharton, Peter Robert
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road
Bradford BD1 4SP / GB
Application number, filing date93925173.218.05.1993
[1995/10]
WO1993US04680
Priority number, dateUS1992088608020.05.1992         Original published format: US 886080
[1995/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9323383
Date:25.11.1993
Language:EN
[1993/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0641330
Date:08.03.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993
[1995/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0641330
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.11.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C229/00, A61K31/195, C07D263/26, C07C53/42, C07C69/347, C07C69/675, C07C247/04, C07C309/73
[1997/20]
Former International [1995/10]C07D263/04, C07C51/58, C07C69/34, C07C69/66, C07C229/00, C07C247/00, C07C303/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/10]
TitleGerman:GABA UND L-GLUTAMINSAÜRE ANALOGA ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER EPILEPSIE[1995/10]
English:GABA AND L-GLUTAMIC ACID ANALOGS FOR ANTISEIZURE TREATMENT[1995/10]
French:ANALOGUES DE GABA ET D'ACIDE L-GLUTAMIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL[1995/10]
Entry into regional phase07.11.1994National basic fee paid 
07.11.1994Search fee paid 
07.11.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
07.11.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/10]
23.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
31.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2001Fee for grant paid
30.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41]
Request for further processing for:14.05.1998Request for further processing filed
09.04.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.06.1998Decision despatched
15.05.1998Request for further processing filed
09.04.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
18.06.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
06.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]  R.B. SILVERMAN ET AL., "3-Alkyl-4-aminobutyric acids: the first class of anticonvulsant agents that activates L-glutamic acid decarboxylase", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1991), vol. 34, no. 7, pages 2295 - 8, XP002027978 [X] 10,16-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00111a053
 [X]  J. COLONGE ET AL., "Préparation de pyrrolidones-2 et de gamma-aminoacides", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIÉTÉ CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, PARIS, FR, (1962), pages 598 - 603, XP002027979 [X] 10,16-22 * the whole document *
 [X]  A.B. MAUGER, "Diastereoisomers of 3-methylpyroglutamic acid and beta-methylglutamic acid", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1981), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 1032 - 5, XP002027980 [X] 17 * the whole document, particularly page 1033, compounds 10 and 11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00318a042
 [X]  R.C. PETTER ET AL., "Inhibition of beta-butyrobetaine hydroxylase by cyclopropyl-substituted gamma-butyrobetaines", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1990), vol. 55, no. 10, pages 3088 - 97, XP002027981 [X] 10,16,17,23 * the whole document, particularly page 3090, compound 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00297a025
 [X]  R.D. ALLAN ET AL., "A new synthesis, resolution and in vitro activities of (R)- and (S)-beta-phenyl-GABA", TETRAHEDRON, OXFORD, GB, (1990), vol. 46, no. 7, pages 2511 - 24, XP002027982 [X] 10,16,17,23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)82032-9
 [X]  Y.N. BELOKON ET AL., "Synthesis of enantio- and diastereo-isomerically pure beta- and gamma-substituted glutamic acids via glycine condensation with activated olefins", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS I, LONDON, GB, (1986), pages 1865 - 72, XP002027983 [X] 17 * the whole document, particularly page 1868, table 1, compounds 8 and 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19860001865
 [X]  Y.C. KIM ET AL., "Glutamic acid analogs. The synthesis of 3-alkylglutamic acids and 4-alkylpyroglutamic acids", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1965), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 509 - 13, XP002027984 [X] 17-19,23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00328a022
 [XY]  S. THAISRIVONGS ET AL., "Renin inhibitors. Design of angiotensinogen transition-states analogues containing novel (2R,3R,4R,5S)-5-amino- 3,4-dihydroxy-2-isopropyl-7-methyloctanoic acid", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1987), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 976 - 82, XP002027985 [XY] 1,24 * pages 977 and 980, compound 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00389a004
 [Y]  A. FADEL ET AL., "Optically active alpha-alkylsuccinates from the stereoselective alkylation of chiral imide enolates", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (1988), vol. 29, no. 48, pages 6257 - 60, XP002027986 [Y] 1,24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)82319-9
 [X]  S. TAKANO ET AL., "Practical synthesis of (R)-gamma-amino-beta-hydroxybutanoic acid (GABOB) from (R)-epichlorohydrin", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (1987), vol. 28, no. 16, pages 183 - 4, XP002027987 [X] 5-9,11-15 * the whole document, particularly reaction (7) to (8) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)95420-0
 [PX]  C.P. TAYLOR ET AL., "Potent and stereospecific anticonvulsant activity of 3-isobutyl GABA relates to in vitro binding at a novel site labeled by tritiated gabapentin", EPILEPSY RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199301), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 11 - 5, XP000646439 [PX] 10,16-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0920-1211(93)90070-N
International search[X]US4173541  (MOLT KENNETH R [US]);
 [X]US4322440  (FISH IRVING, et al);
 [X]US4479005  (KLESCHICK WILLIAM A [US]);
 [X]US4771038  (WOLANIN DONALD J [US], et al);
 [XP]US5145993  (KIM IN O [KR], et al);
 [XP]US5198548  (BEYLIN VLADIMIR [US], et al);
 [XP]WO9209560  (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]);
 [X]JPS4840460B  ;
 [Y]US4814342  (HOOVER DENNIS J [US], et al)
 [X]  - Synthesis, issued December 1989, R. ANDRUSZKIEWICZ, "A Convenient Synthesis of 3-Alkyl-4-Amino Butanoic Acids", see pages 953-955.,
 [Y]  - N. ALLINGER, "Organic Chemistry", published 1971 by Worth Publishers, Inc. (New York), see pages 532-537.,