Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0613053

EP0613053 - Process for removing plastics from microstructures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
microParts Gesellschaft für Mikrostrukturtechnik mbH
Hauert 7
44227 Dortmund / DE
[1999/40]
Former [1994/35]For all designated states
MICROPARTS GESELLSCHAFT FÜR MIKROSTRUKTURTECHNIK mbH
Hauerstrasse 7
D-44227 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reinecke, Holger, Dr.
Schwerter Strasse 306
D-44287 Dortmund / DE
[1994/35]
Application number, filing date94100278.411.01.1994
[1994/35]
Priority number, dateDE1993430392310.02.1993         Original published format: DE 4303923
[1994/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0613053
Date:31.08.1994
Language:DE
[1994/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0613053
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1994
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/42, C08J11/08
[1994/35]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1994/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Beseitigen von Kunststoffen aus Mikrostrukturen[1994/35]
English:Process for removing plastics from microstructures[1994/35]
French:Procédé pour éliminer des matières plastiques de microstructures[1994/35]
Examination procedure18.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/42]
23.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[L]US3873361  (FRANCO JACK R, et al) [L] 1 *In dem oben IBM -Dokument genannt* * claims 1,2,11,13,14 * * figure 1 * * column 4, line 5 - line 10 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 2 *;
 [X]DE1621664  (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [X] 1,4 * claims 1,7 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 4 *;
 [A]EP0485161  (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4-6,10,14 *;
 [A]WO9117484  (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * claim 10 *;
 [A]EP0219789  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,5,6 *;
 [A]GB2173918  (LAPORTE INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1 * claims 13,15 * * page 2, line 30 - line 34 *;
 [A]FR2291607  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,6 *;
 [A]US4165294  (VANDER MEY JOHN E) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * column 6, line 15 - line 19 *
 [X]  IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN page 6588, vol. 25, no. 12, May 1983 MIGLIORE M.J. 'Butyrolactone as a Stripping Solvent in Lift-off Process', [X] 1,4