blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0609707

EP0609707 - Process for detecting the instantaneous frequency [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2000
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.03.2000 [2000/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 80 11 09
81663 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 80 11 09
81663 München / DE
Former [1995/12]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft
D-81663 München / DE
Former [1994/32]For all designated states
Deutsche Aerospace AG
Postfach 80 11 09
D-81663 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zimmer, Manfred, Dr.
Pappelauer Weg 25
D-89077 Ulm / DE
[1994/32]
Representative(s)Fröhling, Werner Otto, et al
Volvo Technology Corporation
Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]Fröhling, Werner Otto, Dr., et al
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Sedanstrasse 10
89077 Ulm / DE
Former [1994/32]Fröhling, Werner Otto, Dr.
Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Sedanstrasse 10
D-89077 Ulm / DE
Application number, filing date94100752.820.01.1994
[1994/32]
Priority number, dateDE1993430267901.02.1993         Original published format: DE 4302679
[1994/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0609707
Date:10.08.1994
Language:DE
[1994/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0609707
Date:17.03.1999
Language:DE
[1999/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.1994
ClassificationIPC:G01R23/167
[1994/32]
CPC:
G01R23/167 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/32]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Momentanfrequenz-Detektion[1994/32]
English:Process for detecting the instantaneous frequency[1994/32]
French:Procédé pour la détermination de la fréquence momentanée[1994/32]
Examination procedure01.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/13]
26.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.1998Fee for grant paid
18.09.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.1999No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199704   M06   Fee paid on   20.05.1997
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0335284  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4326261  (PEOPLES JOHN T)
 [A]  - CIZEK, "INSTANTANEOUS FREQUENCY AND ITS MEASUREMENTS USING DIGITAL FILTERS", SIGNAL PROCESSING VI, THEORIES AND APPLICATIONS,PROCEEDINGS OF EUSIPCO-92, BRUSSELS,BE, (19920824), vol. II, pages 851 - 854, XP000348519 [A] 1
 [A]  - KNIFFEN, "BISPECTRAL MAGNETUDE AND PHASE RECOVERY USING A WIDE BANDWIDTH ACOUSTO-OPTIC PROCESSOR", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW-YORK,US, (19920310), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 1015 - 1029, XP000258283

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.31.001015
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.