Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0610769

EP0610769 - Loudspeaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood
14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/33]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD
14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakamoto, Yoshio
108-6-503 Yokokawa-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1994/33]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
[2008/41]
Former [1994/33]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7/II Aufg.
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date94101385.631.01.1994
[1994/33]
Priority number, dateJP1993003749002.02.1993         Original published format: JP 3749093
[1994/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0610769
Date:17.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0610769
Date:12.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0610769
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04R9/02, H04R9/04
[1994/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/33]
TitleGerman:Lautsprecher[1994/33]
English:Loudspeaker[1994/33]
French:Haut-parleur[1994/33]
Examination procedure10.04.1995Examination requested  [1995/24]
07.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2001Fee for grant paid
05.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99119696.5  / EP0971559
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0531691  (NOKIA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1 * page 3, column 3, line 46 - page 3, column 4, line 20; figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE3730305  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 35; figure 1A *;
 [YA]WO9004317  (HARMAN INT IND [US]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 4; figure 1 * [A] 2;
 [A]EP0503860  (HARMAN INT IND [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, column 2, line 30 - page 3, column 4, line 26; figure - *;
 [A]US3792394  (BERTAGNI J) [A] 1 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 20; figure - *