blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0610937 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0610937



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 879
19.06.2009 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
19.06.2009 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
16.06.2009 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
15.06.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.03.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.03.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.03.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.03.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.03.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.03.2009 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
03.03.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
03.03.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.02.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.12.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.11.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
04.11.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.11.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.08.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
10.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
02.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.07.2008 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.02.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
20.02.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
20.02.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
08.02.2008 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
02.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 19
11.12.2007 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 16
22.11.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
20.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.11.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 9
12.11.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 3
12.11.2007 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 2
15.10.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.10.2007 Claims Appeal 7
05.10.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
05.10.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
11.05.2007 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.05.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.05.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.05.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 12
02.05.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.02.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 49
06.02.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.02.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
05.10.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.10.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.09.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 21
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 4
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 1
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 9
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 10
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
27.09.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 8
27.09.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 21
06.09.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.08.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.08.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.08.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
16.08.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
11.08.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
26.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.05.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.05.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.05.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.05.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
17.05.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
17.05.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
17.05.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
17.05.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.05.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.05.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.05.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
18.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 15
17.02.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
06.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.10.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.10.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.09.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.07.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.07.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
26.04.2004 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
26.04.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.03.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.03.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.02.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.02.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.02.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
19.02.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.02.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
06.02.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.11.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.11.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 16
28.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
18.11.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.09.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.08.2002 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.04.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
12.04.2002 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
13.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.02.2002 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition Opposition 1
20.02.2002 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.02.2002 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.11.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.11.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.09.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
05.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.02.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.02.2001 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.02.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.01.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
26.01.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
26.01.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.01.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 51
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.10.1999 Description Search / examination 25
27.10.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.10.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
02.08.1999 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.08.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
27.07.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
23.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.07.1999 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
15.03.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
15.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
17.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
20.01.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
17.12.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
27.10.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.10.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.06.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.04.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
17.04.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.03.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.02.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.05.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.05.1994 European search report Search / examination 2
21.04.1994 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.1994 Drawings Search / examination 7
21.04.1994 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
21.04.1994 Priority document Search / examination 10
23.03.1994 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
10.02.1994 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.02.1994 Claims Search / examination 4
10.02.1994 Description Search / examination 25
10.02.1994 Drawings Search / examination 7
10.02.1994 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6