blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0610937


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.06.2009 Revocation of patent published on  22.07.2009  [2009/30]
27.02.2009 Deletion: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
27.02.2009 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
29.01.2009 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.11.2008 Change: Date of oral proceedings
11.11.2008 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.08.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
08.07.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
25.04.2008 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  28.05.2008  [2008/22]
16.02.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
07.12.2007 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
07.12.2007 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.11.2007 Change - applicant published on  26.12.2007  [2007/52]
20.07.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
03.05.2007 Change: Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2007 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.10.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
20.08.2005 Change: Appeal number
20.08.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
20.08.2005 Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
30.07.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
11.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.05.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
24.09.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.09.2004 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2004 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
03.04.2004 Unpublished change to opponent data
11.02.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2003 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
05.04.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
04.01.2003 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  19.02.2003  [2003/08]
03.01.2003 Observations of proprietor to parties involved
03.01.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
27.11.2002 Observations of proprietor to parties involved
18.04.2002 Observations of proprietor on opposition
14.11.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
14.09.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
13.07.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
11.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2001 [2001/26]
23.02.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
09.02.2001 Opposition filed published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
02.02.2001 Unpublished change to opponent data
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
23.02.2000 Renewal fee
09.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.07.1999 Change - German title published on  15.09.1999 [1999/37]
28.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
28.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
10.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
08.03.1999 Renewal fee
30.12.1998 Examination report or reply
22.10.1998 Examination report or reply
03.06.1998 Examination report or reply
24.04.1998 Examination report or reply
26.02.1998 Examination report or reply
19.02.1998 Renewal fee
10.10.1997 First examination report
08.10.1997 Examination report or reply
08.10.1997 Request for accelerated examination
02.10.1997 Request for accelerated examination
19.02.1997 Renewal fee
29.02.1996 Renewal fee
14.02.1995 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.1995 [1995/14]
01.07.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.08.1994 [1994/33]