blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0610937
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5866348 02.02.1999A
Priority number Date
US19367994 08.02.1994
AT24393 10.02.1993
US73160096 16.10.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0610937Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0610937 17.08.1994A1
Priority number Date
AT24393 10.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT401526B 25.09.1996B
ATA24393 15.02.1996A
Priority number Date
AT24393 10.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424076D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
AT24393 10.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69424076T 14.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
AT24393 10.02.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5618682 08.04.1997A
Priority number Date
AT24393 10.02.1993