blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0610937

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NL 
 SELapse: 26.07.2000
Examination procedure27.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted26.04.2000
Opposition procedure28.04.2009Date of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition26.07.2005APPEAL FILED
27.09.2005APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
05.12.2007APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:17.08.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL SE
 
Event date:05.04.1995 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19950207
 
Event date:26.11.1997 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19971013
 
Event date:15.09.1999 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:PROCESS FOR DETECTING LUCIFERASE
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL SE
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69424076
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000531
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:16.06.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:26.06.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.
 
Event date:26.07.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000726
 
Event date:28.03.2001 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
Effective DATE:20010126
 
Event date:01.05.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:19.02.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
Effective DATE:20010126
 
Event date:01.04.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
 
Event date:28.05.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
Effective DATE:20010126
 
Event date:01.08.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
 
Event date:26.05.2004 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
Effective DATE:20010126
 
Event date:02.08.2004 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:PROMEGA CORPORATION
 
Event date:10.02.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050210
 
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:PERKINELMER LAS, INC.
 
Event date:03.03.2008 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:PERKINELMER LAS, INC.
Effective DATE:20071226
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Effective DATE:20080301
 
Event date:29.05.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20090224
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.06.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20090227
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:22.07.2009 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20090313
 
Event date:22.07.2009 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Effective DATE:20090313
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20090331
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:01.10.2009 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20090313
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20090217
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:29.06.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20120224
Year of Fee Payment:19