Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0610937

EP0610937 - Process for detecting luciferase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/33]Bioluminescence measurement system
[1999/37]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Revocation of patentpublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PerkinElmer LAS, Inc.
940 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2007/52]
Former [1994/33]For all designated states
Packard Instrument Company, Inc.
2200 Warrenville Road
Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Scheirer, Winfried
Wienergasse 46
A- 2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT
[1994/33]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/33]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date94102080.210.02.1994
[1994/33]
Priority number, dateAT1993000024310.02.1993         Original published format: AT 24393
[1994/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0610937
Date:17.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0610937
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.1994
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/66
[1994/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1994/33]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Nachweisen von Luciferase[1999/37]
English:Process for detecting luciferase[1999/37]
French:Procédé pour détecter luciférase[1999/37]
Former [1994/33]Bioluminessenz Massystem
Former [1994/33]Bioluminescence measurement system
Former [1994/33]Système de mesure de la bioluminescence
Examination procedure07.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/14]
26.09.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
13.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.1997Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
17.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.1999Fee for grant paid
27.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.01.2001  26.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Promega Corporation
2800 Woods Hollow Road
Madison, WI 53711-5399 / US
Opponent's representative
Taormino, Joseph Paul
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/22]
Opponent(s)01  26.01.2001  26.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Promega Corporation
2800 Woods Hollow Road
Madison, WI 53711-5399 / US
Opponent's representative
Taormino, Joseph P., Dr.
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2003/22]
Opponent(s)01  26.01.2001  26.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Promega Corporation
2800 Woods Hollow Road
Madison, WI 53711-5399 / US
Opponent's representative
Ricker, Mathias, Dr.
Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 56
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/08]
Opponent(s)01  26.01.2001  26.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Promega Corporation
2800 Woods Hollow Road
Madison, WI 53711-5399 / US
Opponent's representative
Ricker, Mathias
European Patent Attorney Jones, Day, Reavis & Pogue Hochhaus am Park Grüneburgweg 102
60323 Frankfurt / DE
Former [2001/13]
Opponent(s)01  26.01.2001  26.01.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Promega Corporation
2800 Woods Hollow Road
Madison, WI 53711-5399 / US
Opponent's representative
Ricker, Mathias, Dr.Dipl.-Chem.
Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler, Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
28.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.04.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.08.2002Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2002Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
21.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
17.05.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2008Reply to a communication from the opposition division
20.01.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2009
20.01.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.03.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
13.03.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/30]
28.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.07.2005Appeal received No.  T1048/05
27.09.2005Statement of grounds filed
05.12.2007Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
05.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE26.07.2000
[2008/22]
Former [2007/34]SE26.07.2000
IT10.02.2005
Former [2001/26]SE26.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0015437  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 26 - page 7, line 2; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0022757  (LKB PRODUKTER AB [SE]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0299601  (FOSS ELECTRIC AS N [DK]) [Y] 1-3 * column 8 - column 10 *;
 [A]EP0516443  (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 10-12,18 * column 9; claim - *;
 [A]  I.BJÖRKHEM ET AL., "A Simple, Fully Enzymic Bioluminescent Assay for Triglycerides in Serum", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (198208), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 1742 - 1744, XP002988519 [A] 1,3,4 * page 1742 *