EP0613769 - Method for making a heatable laminated glass containing metallic wires in the interlayer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For:DE
SEKURIT SAINT GOBAIN Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Viktoriaallee 3-5 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | For:AT
BE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
SEKURIT SAINT GOBAIN Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Viktoriaallee 3-5 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [2000/46] | For:AT
BE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE "Les Miroirs" 18, Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
SEKURIT SAINT GOBAIN Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Viktoriaallee 3-5 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [2000/34] | For:AT
BE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL S.A. "Les Miroirs", 18, Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
SEKURIT SAINT GOBAIN Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Viktoriaallee 3-5 52066 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [1994/36] | For:BE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LU
NL
PT
SE
AT
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL S.A. "Les Miroirs", 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
SEKURIT SAINT GOBAIN Deutschland GmbH und Co. KG Viktoriallee 3-5 D-52066 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillner, Manfred Rollefstrasse 526 D-52078 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Mueller, Karl-Heinz Eberburgweg 15 D-52076 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Pikhard, Siegfried Hauptstrasse 137 D-52159 Roetgen / DE | 04 /
Engels, Juergen Dickenbruch 23 D-52223 Stolberg / DE | 05 /
Sauer, Gerd Heinrich-Hamacher-Weg 11 D-52224 Stolberg-Venwegen / DE | 06 /
Reul, Bernhard Veltmanplatz 2 D-52062 Aachen / DE | 07 /
Henn, Klaus Bocholtzerstrasse 60 D-52072 Aachen / DE | 08 /
Maeuser, Helmut Reenstraat 6 NL-6369 SJ Simpelveld / NL | 09 /
Immerschitt, Stefan, Dr. Hundforter Benden 22 D-52134 Herzogenrath / DE | 10 /
Neumann, Dieter Kranzbergstrasse 10 D-52224 Stolberg / DE | [1994/36] | Representative(s) | Biermann, Wilhelm, et al Morillenhang 39 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/36] | Biermann, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. (Pat-Ass.), et al SEKURIT SAINT-GOBAIN DEUTSLAND GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Viktoriaalle 3-5 D-52066 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102523.1 | 19.02.1994 | [1994/36] | Priority number, date | DE19934306122 | 27.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4306122 | DE19934316964 | 21.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4316964 | [1994/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0613769 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0613769 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, H05B3/86, B26F3/06, B23K26/00 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
H05B3/86 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10385 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/351 (KR);
B23K26/361 (EP,US);
B26F3/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer heizbaren Verbundglasscheibe mit in der thermoplastischen Zwischenschicht angeordneten Metalldrähten | [1994/36] | English: | Method for making a heatable laminated glass containing metallic wires in the interlayer | [1994/36] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de vitrage laminé chauffant, contenant des fils métalliques dans la couche intercallaire | [1994/36] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/40] | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR958703 (SKLARNY UNION) [Y] 1 * page 2, column L, line 3 - line 32; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0140112 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,9,10 * page 2, line 9 - line 24 * * page 3, line 1 - line 5 ** page 5, line 20 - line 26; claim - *; | [YA]EP0200089 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 12 - line 51 * * column 11, line 48 - column 12, line 16; figure 2 * [A] 2-4,6,7; | [YA]CH659423 (THAELMANN SCHWERMASCHBAU VEB) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6; | [AP]EP0547692 (IBM [US]) [AP] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [YA] - J. B. BERNSTEIN, S. S. COHEN, P. W. WYATT, "Metal wire cutting by repeated application of low-oower laser pulses", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, NEW YORK, (199206), vol. 63, no. 6, pages 3516 - 3518, XP000301859 [Y] 1 * Experiment; page 3516 * [A] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1143758 |