blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0615756

EP0615756 - Nalbuphine esters and long-acting pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.06.2002  [2002/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NATIONAL SCIENCE COUNCIL
Fl. 18, No 106, Sec. 2, Ho-Ping E. Road
Taipei / TW
[1994/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Oliver, Yoa-Pu Hu
3 F, No 17, Alley 5, Lane 24, Sec 3, Tin Chou Rd
Taipei / TW
02 / Wang, Jhi-Joung
3 F, No 17, Alley 5, Lane 24, Sec 3, Tin Chou Rd
Taipei / TW
03 / Ho, Shung-Tai
3 F, No 17, Alley 5, Lane 24, Sec 3, Tin Chou Rd
Taipei / TW
[1994/38]
Representative(s)Jones, Stephen Anthony, et al
AdamsonJones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham
NG1 1GF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/50]Jones, Stephen Anthony, et al
AdamsonJones Broadway Business Centre 32a Stoney Street
Nottingham NG1 1LL / GB
Former [1999/23]Jones, Stephen Anthony, et al
Lewis & Taylor, 49 Stoney Street
Nottingham, NG1 1LX / GB
Former [1998/02]Round, Edward Mark
Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk
GB-Leicester LE1 7JA / GB
Former [1997/52](deleted)
Former [1994/38]Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date94102571.021.02.1994
[1994/38]
Priority number, dateJP1993005384015.03.1993         Original published format: JP 5384093
US1993016125702.12.1993         Original published format: US 161257
[1994/52]
Former [1994/38]JP1993005384015.03.1993
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0615756
Date:21.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0615756
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.1994
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/485, A61K9/08
[1994/38]
CPC:
A61K31/485 (EP); C07D489/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1994/38]
TitleGerman:Nalbuphinester und diese enthaltende Arzneimittel mit verzögerter Wirkstoffabgabe[1994/38]
English:Nalbuphine esters and long-acting pharmaceutical compositions containing them[1994/38]
French:Esters de nalbuphine, et compositions pharmaceutiques à action prolongée les contenant[1994/38]
Examination procedure21.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/20]
16.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
25.11.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
30.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2001Fee for grant paid
23.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25]
Request for further processing for:30.10.2000Request for further processing filed
23.10.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.11.2000Decision despatched
22.01.1999Request for further processing filed
22.01.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
10.02.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.03.199603   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1996
28.02.199906   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP0250796  (E.I.DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY) [DX] 1-5,7-10,16-20,30-33,42 * claims 1-3,5-7 * * page 8, line 15 - line 47 * * table 1 *;
 [Y]EP0170090  (E.I.DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8203768  (UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY) [A] 1-42 * claims 1,4,6-23 *;
 [A]US4722928  (G.A.BOSWELL) [A] 1-42 * claim - * * tables II-VI *
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890109), vol. 110, no. 2, Database accession no. 13439q [Y] 1-42 * abstract *
    [ ] - M.A.HUSSAIN ET AL., "IMPROVED BUCCAL DELIVERY OF OPIOID ANALGESICS AND ANTAGONISTS WITH BITTERLESS PRODRUGS", PHARM.RES., (1988), vol. 5, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1015958417047, pages 615 - 618, XP009012629

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015958417047
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871102), vol. 107, no. 18, Database accession no. 161526u [Y] 1-42 * abstract *
    [ ] - B.J.AUNGST ET AL., "PRODRUGS FOR IMPROVED ORAL NALBUPHINE BIOAVAILABILITY:INTER-SPECIES DIFFERENCES IN THE DISPOSITION OF NALBUPHINE AND ITS ACETYLSALICYLATE AND ANTHRANILATE ESTERS", INT.J.PHARM., (1987), vol. 38, no. 1-3, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-5173(87)90115-3, pages 199 - 209, XP025813126

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(87)90115-3
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.