Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0617976

EP0617976 - Device to produce aerosol jet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PARI GmbH Spezialisten für effektive Inhalation
Moosstrasse 9
82319 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/45]For all designated states
PARI GmbH Spezialisten für effektive Inhalation
Moosstrasse 9
82319 Starnberg / DE
Former [1994/40]For all designated states
PAUL RITZAU PARI-WERK GmbH
Moosstrasse 9
D-82319 Starnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jaser, Stefan
Augsburgerstrasse 17
D-86399 Bobingen / DE
02 / Knoch, Martin, Dr.
Am Vogelbichl 5
D-82335 Berg / DE
[1994/40]
Representative(s)Zangs, Rainer E. , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]Zangs, Rainer E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Arabellastrasse 4/VIII
D-81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date94102985.228.02.1994
[1994/40]
Priority number, dateDE1993431057531.03.1993         Original published format: DE 4310575
[1994/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0617976
Date:05.10.1994
Language:DE
[1994/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0617976
Date:15.11.1995
Language:DE
[1995/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0617976
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61M11/02, A61M15/00
[1995/43]
Former International [1994/40]A61M11/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/40]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für die Erzeugung von Aerosolpulsen[1994/40]
English:Device to produce aerosol jet[1994/40]
French:Dispositif pour la production de jets d'aérosol[1994/40]
Examination procedure26.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/13]
25.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1999Fee for grant paid
14.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES12.01.2000
FR12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
IT12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
DK12.04.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2004/35]ES12.01.2000
FR12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
DK12.04.2000
Former [2004/07]ES12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
DK12.04.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2003/45]ES12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
DK12.04.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2003/08]ES12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2002/26]ES12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2002/23]SE12.01.2000
AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2002/02]AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2001/37]AT28.02.2000
BE28.02.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2001/11]BE28.02.2000
FR09.06.2000
Former [2001/09]FR09.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US4094317  (WASNICH RICHARD D) [A] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 11 - line 21 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 38; figure 4 *;
 [A]CH625718  (LUWA AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,7,9,11 * page 2, line 42 - line 67; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0178925  (UNIV AUCKLAND [NZ]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2,6-8,11,12,14 *;
 [A]GB2164569  (ETELA HAMEEN KEUHKOVAMMAYHDIST) [A] 1 * page 2, line 71 - line 97; figures 1,2,5 *
Examination   BEINERT T. ET AL, PNEUMOLOGIE, SONDERHEFT NR. 2, (1990), vol. 44, page 1026,