Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0618526

EP0618526 - Method and apparatus for multi-level navigable video environment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.11.1996
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.1996Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.12.1996 [1996/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
US WEST ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
4001 Discovery Drive Boulder
Colorado 80303 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]For all designated states
US WEST ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
4001 Discovery Drive
Boulder, Colorado 80303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hansen, Benjamin E.
10466 Dale Circle
Westminster, Colorado 80234 / US
[1994/40]
Representative(s)Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 16 55
82306 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/40]Grättinger & Partner
Wittelsbacherstrasse 5
D-82319 Starnberg / DE
Application number, filing date94104149.317.03.1994
[1994/40]
Priority number, dateUS1993004080231.03.1993         Original published format: US 40802
[1994/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0618526
Date:05.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0618526
Date:27.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/033, G09B5/00, G11B27/02, G06F15/403, H04N5/262
[1994/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für ein hierarchisches, ansteuerbares Videomilieu[1994/40]
English:Method and apparatus for multi-level navigable video environment[1994/40]
French:Procédé et appareil pour un environnement vidéo multi-niveau et dirigeable[1994/40]
File destroyed:13.09.2003
Examination procedure28.03.1996Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/52]
01.08.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1996/52]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.05.1996M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  - DE MEY ET AL, "Visual Composition and Multimedia", EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTER GRAPHICS 13TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE, CAMBRIDGE, ENGLAND, vol. 11, no. 3, pages C9 - C22 [X] 1,7 * page C19, paragraph 3 - page C20, paragraph 2; figures 14,15 *
 [DA]  - MILLER ET AL, "The Virtual Museum: Interactive 3D Navigation of a Multimedia Database", JOURNAL OF VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER ANIMATION, UK, vol. 3, no. 3, pages 183 - 197, XP000925118 [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - HOFFERT ET AL, "Quicktime: An Extensible Standard for Digital Multimedia", 37TH IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, SAN FRANSISCO, USA, pages 15 - 20 [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KAMEYAMA ET AL, "A Proposal of Multimedia Document Architecture and Video Document Architecture", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, DENVER, USA, pages 511 - 515 [A] 1,7 * Sections 4 and 5 *